Martin Leimgruber
domiciled in Pfaffnau, from Herznach Active mandates: Leimgruber Martin Connected persons: Jelena Leimgruber, Thomas Leimgruber You can stay up to date through "Martin Leimgruber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Leimgruber"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Leimgruber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Leimgruber"
|
|
Martin Leimgruber
domiciled in Bellach, from Zürich Active mandates: Chirurgie Leimgruber & Partner AG Connected persons: Claudia Leimgruber You can stay up to date through "Martin Leimgruber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Leimgruber"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Leimgruber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Leimgruber"
|
|
Martin Leimgruber
domiciled in Basel, from Basel Active mandates: Raiffeisenbank Aesch-Pfeffingen Genossenschaft Connected persons: Eveline Franziska Stöckli-Häring, Matthias Christ, Melanie Walser and more You can stay up to date through "Martin Leimgruber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Leimgruber"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Leimgruber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Leimgruber"
|
|
Martin Leimgruber
domiciled in Abtwil AG, from Herznach-Ueken Active mandates: WoodEnergy GmbH Connected persons: Isidor Leimgruber You can stay up to date through "Martin Leimgruber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Leimgruber"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Leimgruber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Leimgruber"
|
Places where people with the name Martin Leimgruber live
Sectors in which people with the name Martin Leimgruber work
Production and processing of wooden goods
Operation of medical and dental practices
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Forest cultivation and management
Production and processing of wooden goods
Operation of medical and dental practices
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Forest cultivation and management
Private persons with the name Martin Leimgruber
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Martin Leimgruber
Publication number: HR02-1005926308, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Raiffeisenbank Aesch-Pfeffingen Genossenschaft, in Aesch (BL), CHE-107.780.919, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 227 vom 22.11.2023, Publ. 1005891125).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Christ, Matthias, von Holderbank (SO), in Weil am Rhein (DE), Mitglied der Bankleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Leimgruber, Martin, von Basel, in Basel, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Bankleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005674410, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
WoodEnergy GmbH, in Sins, CHE-115.216.733, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 08.02.2018, Publ. 4044901). [Gemeindefusion vom 01.01.2023].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leimgruber, Isidor, von Herznach-Ueken, in Sins, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 19 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: von Herznach];
Leimgruber, Martin, von Herznach-Ueken, in Abtwil, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: von Herznach].
Publication number: HR02-1005674391, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Montezwack GmbH, in Suhr, CHE-445.696.517, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 15.12.2014, S.0, Publ. 1879409). [Gemeindefusion vom 01.01.2023].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leimgruber, Markus, von Herznach-Ueken, in Suhr, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: von Herznach];
Leimgruber, Martina, von Herznach-Ueken, in Suhr, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Herznach].