Nicole Lang
domiciled in Luzern, from Luzern Active mandates: Bau- und Verwaltungs AG Schönbühl Luzern Connected persons: Hans Jörg von Schumacher, Thomas Philipp von Schumacher, Manuela Burkhard and more You can stay up to date through "Nicole Lang", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Nicole Lang"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Nicole Lang", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Nicole Lang"
|
|
Nicole Lang
domiciled in Stein am Rhein, from Rothenthurm Active mandates: Nähwerk GmbH Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Nicole Lang", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Nicole Lang"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Nicole Lang", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Nicole Lang"
|
|
Nicole Lang
domiciled in Stäfa, from Baden Active mandates: AutismusWerk GmbH Connected persons: Michael Lang You can stay up to date through "Nicole Lang", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Nicole Lang"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Nicole Lang", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Nicole Lang"
|
Places where people with the name Nicole Lang live
Sectors in which people with the name Nicole Lang work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Production of clothing
Other social services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Production of clothing
Other social services
Private persons with the name Nicole Lang
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Nicole Lang
Publication number: HR01-1006103990, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
NJR Selections KlG, in Dürnten, CHE-203.691.393, Tannackerstrasse 1, 8632 Tann, Kollektivgesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Beginn:
01.08.2024.
Zweck:
Handel mit alkoholischen Getränken.
Eingetragene Personen:
Cordeiro Pereira, Rafael, von Dürnten, in Hombrechtikon, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lang, Nicole Maria, von Rothenburg, in Rothenburg, Gesellschafterin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Scheidegger, Jarod Dean, von Madiswil, in Dürnten, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005810873, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Bau- und Verwaltungs AG Schönbühl Luzern, in Luzern, CHE-101.436.286, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 03.11.2021, Publ. 1005325794).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Windler-Grüter, Marie Louise, genannt Marlis, von Basadingen-Schlattingen und Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Eschenbach (LU), Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Schumacher, Stefanie, von Luzern, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Dübendorf];
Lang, Nicole, von Luzern, in Luzern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005498949, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Boltsys Engineering GmbH, in Stäfa, CHE-116.375.156, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 230 vom 27.11.2013, S.0, Publ. 1202843).
Statutenänderung:
03.06.2022.
Firma neu:
AutismusWerk GmbH.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Beratung, Unterstützung und Betreuung von Familien und schulischen Einrichtungen im Bereich Autismus Spektrum. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lang, Michael, von Baden, in Stäfa, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Lang, Nicole, von Baden, in Stäfa, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.