Eng-Gwan Kwik
domiciled in Dürnten, from Dällikon Active mandates: KWIK CONSULTING Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Eng-Gwan Kwik", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Eng-Gwan Kwik"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Eng-Gwan Kwik", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Eng-Gwan Kwik"
|
Places where people with the name Eng-Gwan Kwik live
Sectors in which people with the name Eng-Gwan Kwik work
Services regarding management consulting
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Eng-Gwan Kwik
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Eng-Gwan Kwik
Publication number: HR02-1005442783, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
KWIK CONSULTING, in Dällikon, CHE-104.766.969, Einzelunternehmen (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 23.03.2022, Publ. 1005433217).
Sitz neu:
Dürnten.
Domizil neu:
Zelgackerstrasse 14, 8632 Tann.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kwik, Eng-Gwan, von Dällikon, in Dürnten, Inhaber, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Dällikon].
Publication number: 1510703, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 92 vom 14.05.2014 publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 15'720 vom 09.05.2014Habib Bank AG Zürich, in Zürich, CHE-105.951.914, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 14.05.2014, Publ. 1500815).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kwik, Eng, von Dällikon, in Dällikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien. .
Publication number: 4406036, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Habib Bank AG Zürich, in Zürich, CH-020.3.911.224-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 178 vom 14.09.2007, S. 19, Publ. 4110384).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Leuba, Pierre-André, von Buttes, in Jona, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ahmed, Manzoor, von Zürich, in Volketswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Egg];
Ali, Salman, pakistanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Fällanden, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: Ali, Salaman, in Maur];
Khan, Mohsin Ali, von Sirnach, in Wil SG, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Wetzikon ZH];
Schmidli, Irene, von Wädenswil, in Wädenswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Schönenberg ZH];
Schaich, Susanna, von Seuzach, in Kloten, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Schneider, Ralph, von Biel BE, in Jonen, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizedirektor mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Ahmad, Nasir, von Fällanden, in Maur, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Fällanden];
Gänswein, Markus, von Bütschwil, in Sissach, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Binningen];
Ghadiali, Rumi Soli, indischer Staatsangehöriger, in Maur, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zumikon];
Kwik, Eng, von Dällikon, in Dällikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.