Christian Kündig
domiciled in Rickenbach SZ, from Schwyz Active mandates: Schwyzer Kantonalbank Connected persons: Michael Hutmacher, Urs Schatt, Michael Som and more You can stay up to date through "Christian Kündig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Kündig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Kündig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Kündig"
|
|
Christian Kündig
domiciled in Eschenbach, from Bauma Active mandates: Implenia Schweiz AG Connected persons: Markus Bauer, Mirco Scruzzi, Luca Nicolo Dimitri Bettoja and more You can stay up to date through "Christian Kündig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Kündig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Kündig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Kündig"
|
|
Christian Kündig
domiciled in Zürich, from Zürich Active mandates: Kündig AG Connected persons: Regina Kündig, Hannah Kündig, Lukas Kündig and more You can stay up to date through "Christian Kündig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Kündig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Kündig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Kündig"
|
Places where people with the name Christian Kündig live
Sectors in which people with the name Christian Kündig work
Operation of banks and credit institutions
General structural engineering
Manufacturing of tool machinery
Operation of banks and credit institutions
General structural engineering
Manufacturing of tool machinery
Private persons with the name Christian Kündig
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christian Kündig
Publication number: HR02-1005899490, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kündig AG, in Wetzikon (ZH), CHE-102.445.678, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 15.11.2022, Publ. 1005604110).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kündig, Christian, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Kündig, Hannah, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Kündig, Regina, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 3339817, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Pro Idea AG, bisher in Baar, CHE-109.907.622, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 153 vom 11.08.2009, Publ. 5189502).
Statutenänderung:
30.01.2017.
Sitz neu:
Luzern.
Domizil neu:
Weinmarkt 15, 6004 Luzern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Smith, Martin, von Hallwil, in Lausen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kündig, Christian, von Zürich, in Rapperswil-Jona, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Landolt, Rita, von Näfels, in Thalwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zeller Bochsler, Diego, von Liestal, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3298363, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Schwyzer Kantonalbank, in Schwyz, CHE-108.954.429, Besondere Rechtsformen (SHAB Nr. 211 vom 31.10.2016, Publ. 3135087).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmied, Adréan, von Andwil (SG), in Arth, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kündig, Christian, von Schwyz, in Schwyz, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien gemäss OR 459 Absatz 2;
Zimmermann, Philipp, von Vitznau, in Gersau, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien gemäss OR 459 Absatz 2.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suter, Marco, von Muotathal, in Schwyz, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien gemäss OR 459 Absatz 2];
Flury, Rita, von Jenaz, in Stans, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien gemäss OR 459 Absatz 2;
Zaugg, Fabian, von Wyssachen, in Richterswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien gemäss OR 459 Absatz 2.