Thomas Köppel
domiciled in Dübendorf, from Dübendorf Active mandates: Steinemann AG Connected persons: Nicola Mammone, Marco Biser, Markus Scherer and more You can stay up to date through "Thomas Köppel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Thomas Köppel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Thomas Köppel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Thomas Köppel"
|
|
Thomas Köppel
domiciled in Bottmingen, from Widnau Active mandates: Wagemann Köppel KmG Connected persons: Angela Wagemann Köppel You can stay up to date through "Thomas Köppel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Thomas Köppel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Thomas Köppel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Thomas Köppel"
|
|
Thomas Köppel
domiciled in Dättlikon, from Widnau Active mandates: wintok GmbH Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Thomas Köppel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Thomas Köppel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Thomas Köppel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Thomas Köppel"
|
Places where people with the name Thomas Köppel live
Sectors in which people with the name Thomas Köppel work
Trading with various goods
Translation services
Facility management
Trading with various goods
Translation services
Facility management
Private persons with the name Thomas Köppel
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Thomas Köppel
Publication number: HR02-1005622303, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Steinemann AG, in Flawil, CHE-102.064.514, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 204 vom 20.10.2021, Publ. 1005316514).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Osvald, Philipp, von Wittenbach, in Wittenbach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Köppel, Thomas, von Dübendorf, in Dübendorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005293745, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
k.beratung gmbh, in Mellingen, CHE-110.135.754, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 217 vom 09.11.2015, Publ. 2470659).
Firma neu:
k.beratung gmbh in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Aufhebung der Bestimmung über die vom Gesetz abweichende Abtretungsmodalitäten der Stammanteile gemäss Statuten.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 03.09.2021 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Köppel, Karl Albert, von Widnau, in Mellingen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift als Liquidator, mit 6 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Krähenbühl, Jeannine Patrizia, von Signau, in Mägenwil, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Köppel, Jeannine, von Widnau, in Spreitenbach];
Köppel, Thomas, von Widnau, in Täuffelen, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Biel BE].
Publication number: HR01-1004696513, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Wagemann Köppel KmG, in Bottmingen, CHE-141.133.805, Gustackerstrasse 20, 4103 Bottmingen, Kommanditgesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Beginn:
01.08.2019.
Zweck:
Sprachberatung im In- und Ausland sowie Handel mit Produkten aller Art. Übernimmt Aktiven und Passiven des erloschenen Einzelunternehmens " Wagemann Köppel " (CHE-498.501.612), in Bottmingen.
Eingetragene Personen:
Köppel, Thomas, von Widnau, in Bottmingen, unbeschränkt haftender Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Wagemann Köppel, Angela, von Widnau, in Bottmingen, Kommanditärin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Kommanditsumme von CHF 1.00.