Esther Koch
domiciled in Wohlen, from Uezwil Active mandates: ESKO Schulung GmbH Connected persons: Francine Koch You can stay up to date through "Esther Koch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Esther Koch"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Esther Koch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Esther Koch"
|
Places where people with the name Esther Koch live
Sectors in which people with the name Esther Koch work
Other services in education
Other services in education
Private persons with the name Esther Koch
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Esther Koch
Publication number: HR02-1005995865, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
MBU GmbH, in Röschenz, CHE-115.308.499, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 2 vom 05.01.2010, S.6, Publ. 5426938).
Statutenänderung:
15.03.2024.
Sitz neu:
Laufen.
Domizil neu:
Delsbergerstrasse 104, 4242 Laufen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief oder per e-Mail.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bumbacher, Markus, von Spreitenbach, in Röschenz, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Koch, Esther Luzia, von Romoos, in Laufen, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Publication number: HR02-1005072412, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
BK HB Luzern AG, in Luzern, CHE-107.954.094, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 226 vom 21.11.2019, Publ. 1004764693).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Koch, Dr. Arthur, von Meggen, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Koch, Esther, von Luzern, Meggen und Grosswangen, in Horw, mit Einzelprokura.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Engel, Nils, von Saint-Blaise, in Uitikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005061621, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
BK Lugano SA, in Lugano, CHE-105.878.016, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 234 del 01.12.2017, Pubbl. 3904929).
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Koch, Arthur Markus, da Meggen, in Lucerna, amministratore unico, con firma individuale;
Koch, Esther, da Luzern, in Horw, con procura individuale.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Engel, Nils, da Saint-Blaise, in Uitikon Waldegg (Uitikon), amministratore unico, con firma individuale.