Andrea Kobler
domiciled in Montlingen, from Oberriet (SG) Active mandates: Inset AG, Industrie-Elektro-Technik Connected persons: Markus Knechtli, Peter Kobler, Elisabeth Kobler-Weder You can stay up to date through "Andrea Kobler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andrea Kobler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Andrea Kobler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andrea Kobler"
|
|
Andrea Kobler
domiciled in Au, from Rüthi (SG) Active mandates: MP Garage AG Connected persons: Patrick Odermatt You can stay up to date through "Andrea Kobler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andrea Kobler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Andrea Kobler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andrea Kobler"
|
Places where people with the name Andrea Kobler live
Sectors in which people with the name Andrea Kobler work
Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances
Car dealership
Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances
Car dealership
Private persons with the name Andrea Kobler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Andrea Kobler
Publication number: HR02-1005223529, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen
Sartor Holding AG, in Buchs (SG), CHE-103.381.816, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 09.10.2006, S.13, Publ. 3582610).
Firma neu:
Sartor Holding AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 09.06.2021 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kobler, Andreas, von Oberriet SG, in Bad Ragaz, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gantenbein, Hans Rudolf, von Grabs, in Buchs SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004760598, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Sonnenburg Swiss AG, in Uzwil, CHE-116.336.920, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 11.01.2013, S.0, Publ. 7011952).
Statutenänderung:
06.11.2019.
Sitz neu:
St. Gallen.
Domizil neu:
Vadianstrasse 25a, 9000 St. Gallen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kobler, Andrea, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Gangkofen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schäfli, Christof, von Homburg, in Teufen AR, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004474701, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
K+K Metall GmbH, in Altstätten, CHE-434.054.585, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 148 vom 04.08.2015, Publ. 2304173).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kobler, Andreas, von Oberriet SG, in Altstätten, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keel, Thomas, von Rebstein, in Lüchingen (Altstätten), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].