Janin Kettler
domiciled in Bottighofen, from Germany Active mandates: gs Verwaltungs AG in Liquidation, Factory 14 GmbH and more Connected persons: Christian Thurn, Friedrich Karl Albrecht Helmut Scanzoni von Lichtenfels, Alexander Dimai and more You can stay up to date through "Janin Kettler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Janin Kettler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Janin Kettler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Janin Kettler"
|
Places where people with the name Janin Kettler live
Sectors in which people with the name Janin Kettler work
Other freelance work
Services regarding management consulting
Services for banks and credit institutions
Fund management
Other freelance work
Services regarding management consulting
Services for banks and credit institutions
Fund management
Private persons with the name Janin Kettler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Janin Kettler
Publication number: HR02-1005847034, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
gs Verwaltungs AG, in Bottighofen, CHE-103.754.745, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 07.07.2022, Publ. 1005515478).
Firma neu:
gs Verwaltungs AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 30.08.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kettler, Janin, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Bottighofen, Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 4396465, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
MB Financial Advisory GmbH, in Bottighofen, CHE-255.744.022, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 18 vom 26.01.2017, Publ. 3308045).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Biermann, Michael Rolf Joachim, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kreuzlingen, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Dimai, Dr. Alexander, von Fällanden, in Hünenberg See (Hünenberg), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Kettler, Janin, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Bottighofen, mit Einzelunterschrift, [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 4080515, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Factory 14 GmbH, in Bottighofen, CHE-137.334.163, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 67 vom 09.04.2015, Publ. 2087131).
Statutenänderung:
20.02.2018.
Sitz neu:
Kreuzlingen.
Domizil neu:
Rothausstrasse 1, 8280 Kreuzlingen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Scanzoni von Lichtenfels, Susanne, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Bangkok (TH), Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scanzoni von Lichtenfels, Friedrich Karl Albrecht Helmut, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kreuzlingen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Bangkok (TH), Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Kettler, Janin, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Bottighofen, mit Einzelunterschrift, [bisher: Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift].