Anita Kaufmann
domiciled in Basel, from Buus Active mandates: STEF Suisse SA, Pensionskasse der Frigosuisse AG in Liquidation Connected persons: Patrick von Kullwitz, Hans-Peter Harnisch, Christophe Gorin and more You can stay up to date through "Anita Kaufmann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anita Kaufmann"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Anita Kaufmann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anita Kaufmann"
|
|
Anita Kaufmann
domiciled in Ennetbürgen, from Germany Active mandates: Brown 2 Green AG, Duos Chesas SA Connected persons: Thomas Karl Bartholdi, Luca Rinaldo Contardo Padulli, Luca Rinaldo Contardo Padulli You can stay up to date through "Anita Kaufmann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anita Kaufmann"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Anita Kaufmann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anita Kaufmann"
|
Places where people with the name Anita Kaufmann live
Sectors in which people with the name Anita Kaufmann work
Warehousing and logistics
Operation of an pension fund
Operation of other financial institutions
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Warehousing and logistics
Operation of an pension fund
Operation of other financial institutions
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Anita Kaufmann
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Anita Kaufmann
Publication number: HR02-1006025456, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Brown 2 Green AG, in Stans, CHE-262.524.827, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 24.11.2023, Publ. 1005893085).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kaufmann, Anita, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Ennetbürgen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005851930, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Duos Chesas SA, in Stans, CHE-103.907.279, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 147 vom 02.08.2023, Publ. 1005808236).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pfiffner, Mario, von Quarten, in St. Moritz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Padulli, Luca Rinaldo Contardo, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Sils im Engadin/Segl, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Société fiduciaire d'Expertise et de Revision SA (CHE-107.745.082), in Genève, Revisionsstelle;
Kaufmann, Anita, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Ennetbürgen, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: HR02-1005851152, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Pensionskasse der Frigosuisse AG, in Möhlin, CHE-109.744.975, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 06.07.2023, Publ. 1005788978).
Name neu:
Pensionskasse der Frigosuisse AG in Liquidation. Die Stiftung ist gemäss Verfügung der BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht Aargau vom 25.07.2023 aufgehoben.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leutwyler, Oskar, von Leimbach (AG), in Küsnacht (ZH), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien als Liquidator [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Isenschmid, Jürg, von Bern, in Liestal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien als Liquidator [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Kaufmann, Anita, von Buus, in Basel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Liquidatorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien als Liquidatorin [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Mathis, Daniel, von Wolfenschiessen, in Möhlin, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien als Liquidator [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].