Christian Katz
domiciled in Egnach, from Zürich Active mandates: wissen.org Consulting GmbH Connected persons: Ursula Lupfer You can stay up to date through "Christian Katz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Katz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Katz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Katz"
|
Places where people with the name Christian Katz live
Sectors in which people with the name Christian Katz work
Services regarding management consulting
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Christian Katz
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christian Katz
Publication number: HR02-1006111973, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Suneco AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-447.136.324, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 01.05.2024, Publ. 1006022643).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rothlin, Christoph, von Lachen, in Jona (Rapperswil-Jona), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Katz, Christian, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005854503, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
FSG Holding SA, in Zug, CHE-289.495.822, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 234 vom 03.12.2018, Publ. 1004510599).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Katz, Christian, von Zürich, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005781706, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
CAPE2000 GmbH, in Thayngen, CHE-101.214.596, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 5 vom 08.01.2010, S.15, Publ. 5431092).
Firma neu:
CAPE2000 GmbH in Liquidation.
Domizil neu:
Ohne Domizil.
Weitere Adressen:
Liquidationsadresse: c/o TT Tamagni Treuhand GmbH, Brunnenwiesenstrasse 64, 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 26.06.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Katz, Christian Werner, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Stockach (DE), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 10'000.00 [bisher: Katz, Christian W., von Deutschland, in Thayngen, Geschäftsführer, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift];
TT Tamagni Treuhand GmbH (CHE-358.877.677), in Neuhausen am Rheinfall, Liquidatorin;
Tamagni, Mascia, von Bellinzona, in Neunkirch, mit Einzelunterschrift.