Fatbardh Katuci
domiciled in Adligenswil, from Italy Active mandates: Eco-Edil Swiss GmbH Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Fatbardh Katuci", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Fatbardh Katuci"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Fatbardh Katuci", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Fatbardh Katuci"
|
Places where people with the name Fatbardh Katuci live
Sectors in which people with the name Fatbardh Katuci work
Other construction
Other construction
Private persons with the name Fatbardh Katuci
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Fatbardh Katuci
Publication number: HR02-1005772648, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Eco-Edil Swiss GmbH, in Adligenswil, CHE-492.920.985, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 15.09.2021, Publ. 1005291570).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Memetovik, Bekim, nordmazedonischer Staatsangehöriger, in Menziken, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 99 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Katuci, Fatbardh, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Adligenswil, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 101 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005291570, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Eco-Edil Swiss GmbH, in Adligenswil, CHE-492.920.985, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 11.05.2020, Publ. 1004886420).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Katuci, Fatbardh, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Adligenswil, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 101 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Memetovik, Bekim, nordmazedonischer Staatsangehöriger, in Menziken, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 99 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR02-1004886420, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Eco-Edil Swiss GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-492.920.985, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 20.05.2019, Publ. 1004633458).
Statutenänderung:
09.03.2020.
Sitz neu:
Adligenswil.
Domizil neu:
Im Zentrum 1, 6043 Adligenswil.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Katuci, Fatbardh, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Adligenswil, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Emmen].