Didier André Hugues Juillerat
domiciled in Le Brassus, from Petit-Val Active mandates: Expertises, PME Juillerat SA en liquidation, Schweizerischer Verband für Weiterbildung (SVEB) and more Connected persons: Florence Juillerat Rochat, Michael Kraft, Bernhard Grämiger and more You can stay up to date through "Didier André Hugues Juillerat", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Didier André Hugues Juillerat"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Didier André Hugues Juillerat", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Didier André Hugues Juillerat"
|
Places where people with the name Didier André Hugues Juillerat live
Sectors in which people with the name Didier André Hugues Juillerat work
Fiduciary services
Religious, political or secular associations
Other services in education
Fiduciary services
Religious, political or secular associations
Other services in education
Private persons with the name Didier André Hugues Juillerat
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Didier André Hugues Juillerat
Publication number: HR02-1005973593, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Theater und Orchester Biel Solothurn TOBS, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-337.585.654, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2022, Publ. 1005613846).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Juillerat, Didier, von Petit-Val, in Biel/Bienne, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bourquin, Christine Dr., von Sonvilier, in Aarberg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fluri, Kurt, von Solothurn, in Solothurn, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Vust, Michel Christian, von Boudry, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005639936, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Expertises, PME Juillerat SA, à Biel/Bienne, CHE-107.898.099, société anonyme (No. FOSC 20 du 30.01.2013, p.0, Publ. 7041358).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Expertises, PME Juillerat SA en liquidation.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Didier André Hugues Juillerat, Chante-Merle 28, 2502 Biel/Bienne.
Nouvelle restriction à la transmissibilité:
[Les restrictions statutaires de la transmissibilité des actions nominatives sont levées de par la loi]. La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée générale du 08.12.2022.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Juillerat, Ralph, de Châtelat, à Biel/Bienne, président, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Juillerat, Didier André Hugues, de Petit-Val, à Biel/Bienne, membre du conseil d'administration, liquidateur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: de Châtelat, administrateur, avec signature individuelle];
Juillerat Rochat, Florence, de Petit-Val et L'Abbaye, à Lausanne, liquidatrice, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005613846, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Theater und Orchester Biel Solothurn TOBS, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-337.585.654, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 09.07.2021, Publ. 1005245008).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kiefer, Daniel, von Starrkirch-Wil, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Remund Zuffi, Anna Barbara, von Mühleberg, in Bern, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Juillerat, Didier, von Petit-Val, in Biel/Bienne, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Fluri, Kurt, von Solothurn, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Wiedmer, Simon, von Kriegstetten, in Kriegstetten, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.