Christian Imboden
domiciled in Ringgenberg, from Ringgenberg (BE) Active mandates: Christian Imboden, Sägerei + Zimmerei, Holzhandlung und Bauplanung Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Christian Imboden", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Imboden"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Imboden", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Imboden"
|
|
Dr. Christian Imboden
domiciled in Zollikofen, from Unterseen Active mandates: Privatklinik Wyss AG Connected persons: Alexander Schmid, Magnus Ulrich Oetiker, Annamaria Müller and more You can stay up to date through "Dr. Christian Imboden", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Christian Imboden"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dr. Christian Imboden", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Christian Imboden"
|
|
Christian Imboden
domiciled in Raron, from Raron Active mandates: tritec AG Connected persons: Matthias Küng, Marc Vögeli, Miriam Häberli and more You can stay up to date through "Christian Imboden", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Imboden"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Imboden", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Imboden"
|
Places where people with the name Christian Imboden live
Sectors in which people with the name Christian Imboden work
Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work
Operation of hospitals
Other construction
Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work
Operation of hospitals
Other construction
Private persons with the name Christian Imboden
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christian Imboden
Publication number: HR02-1006050286, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
tritec AG, in Steg-Hohtenn, CHE-115.271.376, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 11.04.2024, Publ. 1006006945).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Alectron AG, in Ruswil (CHE-114.626.040), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 27.03.2024 und Bilanz per 31.12.2023. Aktiven von CHF 4'370'619.75 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 2'224'987.62 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da dieselbe Aktionärin sämtliche Aktien der an der Fusion beteiligten Gesellschaften hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kronig, Alessandro, von Zermatt, in Brig-Glis, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit einem Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung oder des Verwaltungsrates.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Imboden, Christian, von Raron, in Raron, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit einem Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung oder des Verwaltungsrates;
Küng, Matthias, von Krauchthal, in Naters, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit einem Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung oder des Verwaltungsrates;
Vögeli, Marc, von Fraubrunnen, in Ipsach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit einem Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung oder des Verwaltungsrates.
Publication number: 3257343, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Holzprofi Zermatt AG, in Zermatt, CHE-366.596.826, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 27.03.2013, Publ. 7122766).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Imboden, Christian Stefan, von St. Niklaus, in Zermatt, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Imboden, Christian, einziges Mitglied mit Einzelunterschrift];
Imboden-Imboden, Susanne, von St. Niklaus, in Zermatt, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3257341, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Holzprofi RenoSan GmbH, in Zermatt, CHE-113.824.413, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 27.03.2013, Publ. 7122768).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Imboden, Christian Stefan, von St. Niklaus, in Zermatt, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Imboden, Christian, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift];
Imboden-Imboden, Susanne, von St. Niklaus, in Zermatt, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.