Peter Hürzeler
domiciled in Erlach, from Uerkheim Active mandates: Hermann und Jeannette Bönzli-Stiftung, HPE GmbH and more Connected persons: Julian Aurelio Ruefer, Anna-Leena Marti Erb, Earl-Dean Bruckdorfer and more You can stay up to date through "Peter Hürzeler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Hürzeler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Peter Hürzeler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Hürzeler"
|
|
Peter Hürzeler
domiciled in Uster, from Zürich and Uerkheim Active mandates: OCI Ocean Management GmbH, Ocean Independence AG Connected persons: Hans Heinrich Christoph Hürzeler, Daniel Küpfer, Claudio Arpino and more You can stay up to date through "Peter Hürzeler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Hürzeler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Peter Hürzeler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Hürzeler"
|
|
Peter Hürzeler
domiciled in Bellach, from Gretzenbach Active mandates: Swiss Timing LTD Connected persons: Michael Thomasius, Daniel Peter Ernst Everts, Dietmar Offenwanger and more You can stay up to date through "Peter Hürzeler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Hürzeler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Peter Hürzeler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Hürzeler"
|
|
Peter Hürzeler
domiciled in Winterthur, from Uerkheim Active mandates: Gewerbehaus Hard AG Winterthur Connected persons: Katharina Weber Wetter, Carlina Anderes, Claudia Schütt Weber and more You can stay up to date through "Peter Hürzeler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Hürzeler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Peter Hürzeler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Hürzeler"
|
Places where people with the name Peter Hürzeler live
Sectors in which people with the name Peter Hürzeler work
Religious, political or secular associations
Trading with various goods
IT services
Services regarding management consulting
Passenger and cargo transportation, ships and coastal vessels
Sport services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Religious, political or secular associations
Trading with various goods
IT services
Services regarding management consulting
Passenger and cargo transportation, ships and coastal vessels
Sport services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Peter Hürzeler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Peter Hürzeler
Publication number: HR02-1005447466, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Beck roof consulting AG, in Ligerz, CHE-113.954.725, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 208 vom 26.10.2021, Publ. 1005319861).
Firma neu:
Beck roof consulting AG in Liq..
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 31.03.2022 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hürzeler, Peter, von Gretzenbach, in Ligerz, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hürzeler, Marie Louise, von Gretzenbach, in Ligerz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005319861, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Beck roof consulting AG, in Ligerz, CHE-113.954.725, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 12.04.2018, Publ. 4166507). Gemäss Erklärung vom 12.10.2021 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meichtry Treuhand AG (CHE-111.713.151), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hürzeler, Peter Pius, von Gretzenbach, in Ligerz, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hürzeler-Schenker, Marie Louise, von Gretzenbach, in Ligerz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005130944, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Vorsorgestiftung der Imedco AG, in Hägendorf, CHE-109.789.392, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2018, Publ. 4069585).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hürzeler, Peter, von Uerkheim, in Dulliken, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schläpfer, Urs, von Rehetobel, in Murgenthal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.