Bernard Georges Lucien Houche
domiciled in Puidoux, from France Active mandates: Happy Food SA en liquidation, SCM Signalisation Citadine Moderne S.A. en liquidation and more Connected persons: Franco Palmisano, Isabella Laurence Ceccon, Lucien Feniello and more You can stay up to date through "Bernard Georges Lucien Houche", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bernard Georges Lucien Houche"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Bernard Georges Lucien Houche", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bernard Georges Lucien Houche"
|
Places where people with the name Bernard Georges Lucien Houche live
Sectors in which people with the name Bernard Georges Lucien Houche work
Other gastronomical services
Advertising services
Temp agency services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Other services in education
Operation of other financial institutions
Other gastronomical services
Advertising services
Temp agency services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Other services in education
Operation of other financial institutions
Private persons with the name Bernard Georges Lucien Houche
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Bernard Georges Lucien Houche
Publication number: HR02-1005083450, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
11i-Job AG, in Solothurn, CHE-255.255.119, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 15.12.2020, Publ. 1005047821).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Houche, Bernard Georges Lucien, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Puidoux, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Güggi, Peter, von Grenchen, in Hubersdorf, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 4450658, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Randstad (Schweiz) AG, in Thun, CH-092.9.016.889-6, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 15.11.2007, S. 4, Publ. 4200834).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Zürich.
Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz:
CH-020.3.916.127-7.
Handelsregistereintragung Hauptsitz:
[Streichung des Eintragungsdatums von Amtes wegen gemäss Art. 110 HRegV] [gestrichen: Handelsregistereintragung Hauptsitz: 19.09.1978 (letzte SHAB-Publikation: Nr. 184 vom 24.9.2007, S. 23)].
Zweck Hauptsitz:
[Streichung des Zwecks von Amtes wegen gemäss Art. 110 Abs. 1 lit. d HRegV].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Houche, Bernard, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Vionnaz, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Houche, Brigitte, von Noiraigue, in Vionnaz, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4450660, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Randstad (Schweiz) AG, in Interlaken, CH-092.9.018.095-7, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 15.11.2007, S. 4, Publ. 4200836).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Zürich.
Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz:
CH-020.3.916.127-7.
Handelsregistereintragung Hauptsitz:
[Streichung des Eintragungsdatums vom Amtes wegen gemäss Art. 110 HRegV] [gestrichen: Handelsregistereintragung Hauptsitz: 19.09.1978 (letzte SHAB-Publikation: Nr. 184 vom 24.9.2007, S. 23)].
Zweck Hauptsitz:
[Streichung des Zwecks von Amtes wegen gemäss Art. 110 Abs. 1 lit. d HRegV].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Houche, Bernard, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Vionnaz, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Houche, Brigitte, von Noiraigue, in Vionnaz, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.