Rolf Helbling
domiciled in Zürich, from Rapperswil-Jona Active mandates: dima & partner ag, ReCon Bau Property AG and more Connected persons: Jürg Peter Fischli, Fridolin Noser, Vito Pantalena and more You can stay up to date through "Rolf Helbling", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rolf Helbling"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Rolf Helbling", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rolf Helbling"
|
|
Rolf Helbling
domiciled in Andwil, from Kaltbrunn Active mandates: Helbling Reisen AG Connected persons: Marcel Gehring, Michael Mettler You can stay up to date through "Rolf Helbling", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rolf Helbling"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Rolf Helbling", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rolf Helbling"
|
Places where people with the name Rolf Helbling live
Sectors in which people with the name Rolf Helbling work
Architectural and engineering activities
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of other financial institutions
Fund management
Travel agency and tour operator services
Architectural and engineering activities
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of other financial institutions
Fund management
Travel agency and tour operator services
Private persons with the name Rolf Helbling
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Rolf Helbling
Publication number: HR02-1005789784, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
dima & partner ag, in Glarus, CHE-115.282.782, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 27.12.2022, Publ. 1005638640).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fischli, Jürg Peter, von Glarus Nord, in Netstal (Glarus), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Helbling, Rolf, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005492242, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Gesetzlicher Garantiefonds der Schweizer Reisebranche, in Zürich, CHE-108.250.340, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 19.04.2022, Publ. 1005452391).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Helbling, Rolf, von Kaltbrunn, in Andwil SG, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Römer, Stefan Josef, von Amden, in Gossau (ZH), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004527181, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.2018 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 44'563 vom 10.12.2018 Carnot Capital AG, in Zürich, CHE-113.757.610, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.2018, Publ. 1004519484). Rolf Helbling wurde irrtümlich im SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.2018 publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 44'563 vom 10.12.2018 als Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien gelöscht. Er bleibt weiterhin Geschäftsführer mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, deshalb erfolgt untenstehender Eintrag.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Helbling, Rolf, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.