Gisela Heiligensetzer Dussin
domiciled in Wettswil, from Glarus Nord Active mandates: Aquila AG, Scintillae Stiftung Connected persons: Margot An von Planta, Claudia Wyss Schlegel, Carine Frick-Delaloye and more You can stay up to date through "Gisela Heiligensetzer Dussin", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Gisela Heiligensetzer Dussin"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Gisela Heiligensetzer Dussin", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Gisela Heiligensetzer Dussin"
|
Places where people with the name Gisela Heiligensetzer Dussin live
Sectors in which people with the name Gisela Heiligensetzer Dussin work
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Other social services
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Other social services
Private persons with the name Gisela Heiligensetzer Dussin
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Gisela Heiligensetzer Dussin
Publication number: HR02-1005575503, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 173 vom 07.09.2022 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 35209 vom 02.09.2022 Aquila AG, in Zürich, CHE-109.023.479, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 07.09.2022, Publ. 1005556182).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Heiligensetzer Dussin, Gisela, von Glarus Nord, in Wettswil am Albis, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [nicht: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005556182, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Aquila AG, in Zürich, CHE-109.023.479, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 157 vom 16.08.2022, Publ. 1005541521).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Blattner Schmutz, Nadine, von Vechigen, in Freienbach, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Heiligensetzer Dussin, Gisela, von Glarus Nord, in Wettswil am Albis, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meister, Danièle, von Zürich, in Erlenbach (ZH), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Küsnacht (ZH)].
Publication number: HR02-1004626095, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Walser Human Consulting GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-113.674.390, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 14.02.2017, S.0, Publ. 3345285).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Heiligensetzer Dussin, Gisela, von Glarus Nord, in Wettswil am Albis, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Walser, Dagmar, von Quarten, in Küsnacht (ZH), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 10'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00].