Jürg Hauser
domiciled in Uster, from Zürich and Trasadingen Active mandates: Jürg Hauser, Steuerrechts- und Treuhandpraxis Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Jürg Hauser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jürg Hauser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jürg Hauser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jürg Hauser"
|
|
Jürg Hauser
domiciled in Turgi, from Wädenswil Active mandates: Zürcher Kantonalbank Connected persons: Per Schmid, André Stöckli, Luca Mühlemann and more You can stay up to date through "Jürg Hauser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jürg Hauser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jürg Hauser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jürg Hauser"
|
|
Jürg Hauser
domiciled in Wädenswil, from Wädenswil Active mandates: Jürg Hauser music Connected persons: Judith Hauser You can stay up to date through "Jürg Hauser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jürg Hauser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jürg Hauser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jürg Hauser"
|
|
Jürg Hauser
domiciled in Stansstad, from Winterthur Active mandates: KUNDERT AG Connected persons: Daniel Hilty, Pascal Stefan Kundert, Dominic Schmid and more You can stay up to date through "Jürg Hauser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jürg Hauser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jürg Hauser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jürg Hauser"
|
Places where people with the name Jürg Hauser live
Sectors in which people with the name Jürg Hauser work
Fiduciary services
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Repair of other goods
Manufacturing of rubber and plastic products
Fiduciary services
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Repair of other goods
Manufacturing of rubber and plastic products
Private persons with the name Jürg Hauser
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Jürg Hauser
Publication number: HR02-1005870668, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
LineCom GmbH, in Oberägeri, CHE-104.547.628, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 10.01.2019, Publ. 1004538143).
Firma neu:
LineCom GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 13.10.2023 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hauser, Jürg, von Winterthur, in Oberägeri, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hofstetter, Pia, von Auw und Arth, in Oberägeri, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: von Auw und Arth, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005444469, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Kundert AG Jona, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-105.965.342, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 10 vom 16.01.2019, Publ. 1004543031).
Statutenänderung:
30.03.2022.
Firma neu:
KUNDERT AG.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Einkauf, Produktion, Verkauf von technischen Kunststoff-Halbzeugen und -Fertigteilen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen. [Anpassung aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften.]. [gestrichen: Die vor der Eintragung im Handelsregister des Kantons St. Gallen gestrichenen Tatsachen, sowie allfällige frühere Statutendaten oder Tagebuch- und SHAB-Zitate können im Registerauszug des bisherigen Sitzes, welcher bei den abgelegten Handelsregisterakten liegt, eingesehen werden.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hauser, Jürg, von Winterthur, in Stansstad, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Richterswil].
Publication number: HR02-1004998375, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Musikhaus Ewald Hauser AG, in Wädenswil, CHE-107.928.688, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 17.11.2009, S.25, Publ. 5346818).
Firma neu:
Musikhaus Ewald Hauser AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 01.10.2020 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hauser, Ewald, von Wädenswil, in Wädenswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Hütten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hauser-Huber, Rosa, von Wädenswil, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Hütten];
Hauser, Jürg, von Wädenswil, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Hütten].