Jørgen Hauglund
domiciled in Charlottenlund, from Denmark Active mandates: Concordium AG Connected persons: Simone Monnerat You can stay up to date through "Jørgen Hauglund", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jørgen Hauglund"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jørgen Hauglund", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jørgen Hauglund"
|
|
Jorgen Hauglund
domiciled in Charlottenlund, from Denmark Active mandates: Concordium Reg DeFi Lab AG Connected persons: Simon Werner Baumgartner You can stay up to date through "Jorgen Hauglund", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jorgen Hauglund"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jorgen Hauglund", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jorgen Hauglund"
|
Places where people with the name Jørgen Hauglund live
Sectors in which people with the name Jørgen Hauglund work
IT services
IT services
Private persons with the name Jørgen Hauglund
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Jørgen Hauglund
Publication number: HR02-1005723854, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Concordium AG, in Cham, CHE-473.758.684, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 13.09.2022, Publ. 1005560424).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schröder, Lone Fons, dänische Staatsangehörige, in Glarus Süd, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Vorsitzende der Geschäftsleitung (CEO), mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Monnerat, Simone, von Cham, in Cham, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Hauglund, Jørgen, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Charlottenlund (DK), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung (CEO), mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005635775, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Concordium Reg DeFi Lab AG, bisher in Zürich, CHE-264.617.457, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 224 vom 17.11.2022, Publ. 1005606188).
Statutenänderung:
01.12.2022.
Sitz neu:
Cham.
Domizil neu:
St. Andreas 7, 6330 Cham.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hauglund, Jorgen, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Charlottenlund (DK), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Baumgartner, Simon, von Root, in Hünenberg, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005560424, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Concordium AG, in Zug, CHE-473.758.684, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 193 vom 07.10.2019, Publ. 1004731439).
Statutenänderung:
29.08.2022.
Sitz neu:
Cham.
Domizil neu:
St. Andreas 7, 6330 Cham. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brühwiler, Marc, von Fischingen, in Baar, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schröder, Lone Fons, dänische Staatsangehörige, in Glarus Süd, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Vorsitzende der Geschäftsleitung (CEO), mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Paradiso, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Vorsitzende der Geschäftsleitung (CEO), mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hauglund, Jørgen, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Charlottenlund (DK), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.