Yann Gysler
domiciled in Donneloye, from Langnau im Emmental Active mandates: MCF Construction Sàrl Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Yann Gysler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Yann Gysler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Yann Gysler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Yann Gysler"
|
Places where people with the name Yann Gysler live
Sectors in which people with the name Yann Gysler work
General structural engineering
General structural engineering
Private persons with the name Yann Gysler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Yann Gysler
Publication number: 1784085, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Les Courtiers Associés Ouest Lémanique Sàrl, à Collombey-Muraz, CHE-115.634.941, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 207 du 25.10.2013, Publ. 1147007).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Les Courtiers Associés Ouest Lémanique Sàrl en liquidation. La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée générale du 17.10.2014.
Adresse de liquidation:
Avenue des Baumettes 9, 1020 Renens.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gysler, Yann, de Langnau im Emmental, à Grandson, associé et liquidateur, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: associé et président des gérants avec signature individuelle];
Wallach, Sophie, de Ardon, à Pompaples, associée, sans droit de signature, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: associée et gérante avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: 1147007, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Be For Broking Sàrl, à Collombey-Muraz, CH-621.4.008.017-3, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 125 du 29.06.2012, Publ. 6743116).
Modification des statuts:
04.10.2013.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Les Courtiers Associés Ouest Lémanique Sàrl.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Trolliet, Alain, de Seigneux, à Cugy VD, associé-gérant et président, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00;
Trolliet, Patricia, de Champagne et Seigneux, à Cugy VD, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gysler, Yann, de Langnau im Emmental, à Grandson, associé et président des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00;
Wallach, Sophie, de Ardon, à Pompaples, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.