Dr. Thomas Gutekunst
domiciled in Basel, from Riehen and Basel Active mandates: Gesellschaftshaus zum Rebhaus AG Connected persons: Stephan Rosch, Johann Werner Imbach, Peter Stalder and more You can stay up to date through "Dr. Thomas Gutekunst", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Thomas Gutekunst"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dr. Thomas Gutekunst", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Thomas Gutekunst"
|
|
Thomas Gutekunst
domiciled in Binningen, from Basel Active mandates: CTG Investment GmbH, Personalvorsorgestiftung der Gutekunst AG in Liquidation and more Connected persons: Hubertus Ludwig, Josy Bey, Michel Nussbaumer and more You can stay up to date through "Thomas Gutekunst", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Thomas Gutekunst"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Thomas Gutekunst", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Thomas Gutekunst"
|
Places where people with the name Thomas Gutekunst live
Sectors in which people with the name Thomas Gutekunst work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Services for banks and credit institutions
Operation of an pension fund
Other social services
Repair and installation of machines and equipment
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Services for banks and credit institutions
Operation of an pension fund
Other social services
Repair and installation of machines and equipment
Private persons with the name Thomas Gutekunst
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Thomas Gutekunst
Publication number: HR02-1005631891, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Hans-Peter Gutekunst-Stiftung, in Basel, CHE-110.001.220, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2020, Publ. 1005054890).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baltreu AG (CHE-450.792.693), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ludwig, Dr. Hubertus, von Gelterkinden, in Sissach, amtlicher Verwalter und Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: amtlicher Verwalter, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Gutekunst, Thomas, von Basel, in Binningen, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Gutekunst, Alexandra Ethel, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Testaris AG (CHE-245.886.063), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005527135, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Gutag AG, in Arlesheim, CHE-102.330.839, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 13.10.2021, Publ. 1005311484).
Firma neu:
Gutag AG in Liquidation.
Weitere Adressen:
Liquidationsadresse:, c/o Ludwig + Partner AG, St. Alban-Vorstadt 110, Postfach 419, 4010 Basel. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 14.07.2022 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gutekunst, Thomas, von Basel, in Binningen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ludwig, Dr. Hubertus, von Gelterkinden, in Sissach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005256664, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Gutag AG, in Arlesheim, CHE-102.330.839, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 81 vom 27.04.2017, Publ. 3489939).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gutekunst, Alexandra, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ludwig, Dr. Hubertus, von Gelterkinden, in Sissach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Gutekunst, Thomas, von Basel, in Binningen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].