Stefano Granieri
domiciled in Pully, from Bex Active mandates: Système D Sàrl, CTA-FINANCE LTD, Nicosie (Chypre), succursale de Lausanne and more Connected persons: Defrim Robaj, Christian Bauer, Aurélie Mottard Egret and more You can stay up to date through "Stefano Granieri", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefano Granieri"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Stefano Granieri", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefano Granieri"
|
Places where people with the name Stefano Granieri live
Sectors in which people with the name Stefano Granieri work
Business management and administration
Services for banks and credit institutions
Other construction
Operation of bars
Services regarding management consulting
Fiduciary services
Business management and administration
Services for banks and credit institutions
Other construction
Operation of bars
Services regarding management consulting
Fiduciary services
Private persons with the name Stefano Granieri
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Stefano Granieri
Publication number: 3076193, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
SPI Flemming Trust AG, in Zürich, CHE-103.580.882, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 23.07.2015, Publ. 2285451).
Firma neu:
SPI Flemming Trust AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 25.07.2016 aufgelöst.
Liquidationsadresse:
c/o Stefano Granieri, Chemin des Chênes 9, 1009 Pully.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Granieri, Stefano, von Bex, in Pully, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Mirabaud Asset Management AG, in Zürich, Erbringung von Beratungsdiensten von der Schweiz aus zur Vermögensverwaltung und für Investitionen, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 211 vom 31.10.2001, S. 8530).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Granieri, Stefano, von Bex, in Pully, Vize-Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kessler, Nicholas Eric, von Winterthur, in Küsnacht ZH, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bel, Pierre-Laurent, von Veyrier, in Collonge-Bellerive, Vize-Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Mirabaud & Cie, Zweigniederlassung Zürich, in Zürich, Betreiben einer Bank, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 152 vom 09.08.2001, S. 6120).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Genf.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Granieri, Stefano, von Bex, in Pully, Vize-Direktor, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Mayer, Antoni, von Sisikon, in Chêne-Bougeries, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Amrein, Hans Peter, von Luzern, in La Punt, Vize-Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
de Buman, Nicolas, von Fribourg, in Zürich, Vize- Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.