Christian Glauser
domiciled in Trenquanda, from Ferenbalm Active mandates: G-Cube Sàrl Connected persons: Camil Glauser, Manuel Glauser You can stay up to date through "Christian Glauser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Glauser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Glauser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Glauser"
|
|
Christian Glauser
domiciled in Aegerten, from Mötschwil Active mandates: Dihawag AG Connected persons: Markus Horn, Christoph Schlaginhaufen, Christian Haberzeth You can stay up to date through "Christian Glauser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Glauser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Glauser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Glauser"
|
Places where people with the name Christian Glauser live
Sectors in which people with the name Christian Glauser work
Architectural and engineering activities
Trading with various goods
Architectural and engineering activities
Trading with various goods
Private persons with the name Christian Glauser
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christian Glauser
Publication number: HR02-1005543800, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Glauser Spenglerei - Bedachungen AG, in Krauchthal, CHE-107.182.747, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 110 vom 11.06.2019, Publ. 1004647747).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Glauser, Christian, von Muri bei Bern, in Bern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Glauser-Bernasconi, Cornelia, von Muri bei Bern, in Bern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Glauser, Stephan, von Gsteig, in Hettiswil b. Hindelbank (Krauchthal), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Krauchthal (Hettiswil bei Hindelbank), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Glauser-Bangerter, Christina, von Lyss und Gsteig, in Hettiswil b. Hindelbank (Krauchthal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Krauchthal, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004660995, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Dihawag AG, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-107.960.396, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2018, Publ. 4068997).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Haberzeth, Inge, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Niederhasli, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mühlemann, Walter, von Alchenstorf, in Safnern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Horn, Markus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Tübingen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Glauser, Christian, von Mötschwil, in Aegerten, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2108211, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Coopérative d'habitation Crêt-Georges, à Tramelan, CHE-102.341.470, société coopérative (No. FOSC 170 du 02.09.2011, Publ. 6318722).
Modification des statuts:
05.03.2015.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Société Coopérative d'habitation Crêt-Georges.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Valérie Hasler, Rue de la Printanière 40, 2720 Tramelan.
Nouvelles communications:
Communications aux associés: par lettre.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Baumann, Max, de Grindelwald, à Le Bémont (Le Bémont JU), caissier, avec signature collective à deux;
Glauser, Christian, de Rüti bei Lyssach, à Courtelary, président, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Voumard, Françis, de Tramelan, à Nyon, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Hasler, Valérie, de Männedorf et Tramelan, à Tramelan, secrétaire et caissière, avec signature collective à deux.