Shoni Georges Shimon Gilon
domiciled in Zürich, from Adliswil Active mandates: Pure Production AG, Pure Pharma AG and more Connected persons: Bianca Adam, Luca Cereghetti, Nicolaus Von Rintelen and more You can stay up to date through "Shoni Georges Shimon Gilon", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Shoni Georges Shimon Gilon"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Shoni Georges Shimon Gilon", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Shoni Georges Shimon Gilon"
|
Places where people with the name Shoni Georges Shimon Gilon live
Sectors in which people with the name Shoni Georges Shimon Gilon work
Trading in agricultural products and livestock
Production of pharmaceutical substances
Other freelance work
Research and development
Operation of investment companies
Trading in agricultural products and livestock
Production of pharmaceutical substances
Other freelance work
Research and development
Operation of investment companies
Private persons with the name Shoni Georges Shimon Gilon
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Shoni Georges Shimon Gilon
Publication number: HR02-1005661865, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
RS-VALUE AG, in Zürich, CHE-427.868.654, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 06.07.2022, Publ. 1005513492).
Statutenänderung:
17.01.2023.
Sitz neu:
Opfikon.
Domizil neu:
Grätzlistrasse 60, 8152 Opfikon.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gilon, Shoni Georges Shimon, von Adliswil, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stadelmann, Reto, von Zürich, in Opfikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005513492, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
RS-VALUE AG, in Zürich, CHE-427.868.654, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 17.09.2019, Publ. 1004717395).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stadelmann, Sabrina Sandra, von Zürich, in Opfikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gilon, Shoni Georges Shimon, von Adliswil, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005370056, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
DEOM Production AG, in Fischbach-Göslikon, CHE-390.121.406, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 178 vom 14.09.2021, Publ. 1005291005).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Senn, Stevens, von Zürich, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gilon, Shoni Georges Shimon, von Adliswil, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sahli, Marc, von Wohlen bei Bern, in Hettlingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Müller, Daniela, von Obermumpf, in Frick, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sponagel, Swen, von Zürich, in Küsnacht (ZH), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dejan, Robert, slowenischer Staatsangehöriger, in Ehrendingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pantovic, Dusan, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Dietlikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.