Chantal Gerber
domiciled in Troinex, from Langnau im Emmental Active mandates: SIRC SA Connected persons: Jean Gerber You can stay up to date through "Chantal Gerber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Chantal Gerber"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Chantal Gerber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Chantal Gerber"
|
|
Chantal Gerber
domiciled in Wängi, from Ehrendingen Active mandates: P. & R. Frei GmbH Connected persons: Marlen Bertagnoli-Frei, Regula Frei, Pius Frei You can stay up to date through "Chantal Gerber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Chantal Gerber"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Chantal Gerber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Chantal Gerber"
|
Places where people with the name Chantal Gerber live
Sectors in which people with the name Chantal Gerber work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Chantal Gerber
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Chantal Gerber
Publication number: HR02-1005958068, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Thermoréseau - Porrentruy S.A., à Porrentruy, CHE-105.156.348, société anonyme (No. FOSC 88 du 07.05.2021, Publ. 1005174430).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Meusy, Yves Etienne Marc, de Basse-Allaine, à Porrentruy, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Boillat, François Xavier Joseph, de Le Bémont JU, à Saignelégier, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux;
Beuret Siess, Rosalie, de Les Breuleux, à Porrentruy, membre du conseil d'administration, sans droit de signature;
Brülhart, Pierre Marcel Joseph, de Les Enfers, à Delémont, membre, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Nicoulin, Didier Joseph Fernand, de Haute-Ajoie, à Porrentruy, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre, sans droit de signature];
Gerber, Chantal Véronique, de Langnau im Emmental, à Porrentruy, vice-présidente du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Hauser, Sébastien Jean Bernard, de Rüschlikon, à Delémont, membre du conseil d'administration, sans droit de signature;
Lazzara, Stéphanie, de Basse-Vendline, à Courfaivre (Haute-Sorne), membre du conseil d'administration, sans droit de signature;
Theilkäs, Alain Marcel, de Stocken-Höfen, à Porrentruy, membre du conseil d'administration, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: HR02-1005669687, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
P. & R. Frei GmbH, in Münchwilen (TG), CHE-113.397.492, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 30.12.2008, S.27, Publ. 4807326).
Vinkulierung neu:
Vom Gesetz abweichende Abtretungsmodalitäten der Stammanteile gemäss Statuten. [Vinkulierungsnachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 21 vom 31.01.2007 publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 312 vom 25.01.2007.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bertagnoli-Frei, Marlen, von Ehrendingen, in Henau (Uzwil), Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00;
Gerber, Chantal, von Ehrendingen, in Wängi, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00;
Frei, Pius, von Ehrendingen, in Münchwilen TG, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00];
Frei, Regula, von Ehrendingen, in Münchwilen TG, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005083086, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Verein Wohnheime im Seefeld, in Zürich, CHE-101.278.202, Verein (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 22.07.2020, Publ. 1004942419).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gerber, Chantal, von Sumiswald, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ledermann, Nicole, von Zollikon, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.