Andrea Gentsch
domiciled in Unterstammheim, from Neunforn and Stammheim Active mandates: Walter Schwendimann AG Connected persons: Reto Gentsch You can stay up to date through "Andrea Gentsch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andrea Gentsch"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Andrea Gentsch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andrea Gentsch"
|
Places where people with the name Andrea Gentsch live
Sectors in which people with the name Andrea Gentsch work
Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work
Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work
Private persons with the name Andrea Gentsch
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Andrea Gentsch
Publication number: HR02-1005549101, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Büro für Erfrischung GmbH, in Winterthur, CHE-157.616.446, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 105 vom 03.06.2020, Publ. 1004901380).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gentsch, Andreas, von Neunforn, in Winterthur, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6043592, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 30 vom 11.02.2011, S. 25, publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 5'393 vom 07.02.2011. Walter Schwendimann AG, in Unterstammheim, CH-020.3.923.486-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 30 vom 11.02.2011, S. 25, Publ. 6030420).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gentsch, Andrea, von Waltalingen und Neunforn, in Unterstammheim, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [nicht: von Unterstammheim].
Publication number: 4256676, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Kranken-Mobilien-Magazin im Quartier Zürich-Oberstrass, in Zürich, CH-020.7.904.334-1, Bereitstellung, Unterhalt und Ausleihung von Mobilien und Hilfsmitteln aller Art für die Krankenpflege, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 161 vom 22.08.2006, S. 19, Publ. 3516184).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Solenthaler, Ursula, von Zürich, in Zürich, Quästor, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schärer, Martin, von Horgen, in Regensberg, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gentsch, Andrea Max, von Neunforn, in Zürich, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Minoretti, Heidi, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Zurlinden, Anita, von Zofingen, in Zürich, Quästorin (nicht Mitglied), mit Einzelunterschrift.