Virginie Gay
domiciled in Fully, from Sion Active mandates: LA VIE EN ROSE ASSOCIATION, ECIVA Sàrl Connected persons: Manuella Hachet, Stéphanie Maude Peipers You can stay up to date through "Virginie Gay", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Virginie Gay"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Virginie Gay", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Virginie Gay"
|
|
Virginie Gay
domiciled in Gimel, from Echichens Active mandates: Laiterie Fromagerie Kevin Gay Sàrl Connected persons: Kevin Gay You can stay up to date through "Virginie Gay", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Virginie Gay"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Virginie Gay", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Virginie Gay"
|
|
Virginie Gay
domiciled in Les Valettes, from Martigny Active mandates: Gérance CASA Sàrl Connected persons: Caroline Sarrasin Eugster You can stay up to date through "Virginie Gay", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Virginie Gay"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Virginie Gay", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Virginie Gay"
|
Places where people with the name Virginie Gay live
Sectors in which people with the name Virginie Gay work
Other social services
Services regarding management consulting
Production of comestibles
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Other social services
Services regarding management consulting
Production of comestibles
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Virginie Gay
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Virginie Gay
Publication number: HR02-1006087300, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Hôtel du Forum l'Olivier SA, à Martigny, CHE-103.028.811, société anonyme (No. FOSC 12 du 18.01.2023, Publ. 1005655628).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Gay, Virginie, de Martigny, à Bovernier, administratrice unique, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Vallotton, Olivier Gérard, de Martigny, à Martigny, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005947986, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
ECIVA Sàrl, précédemment à Morges, CHE-333.019.657, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 229 du 26.11.2018, Publ. 1004506113).
Modification des statuts:
21.12.2023.
Nouveau siège:
Fully.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue Marais Champagne 20, 1926 Fully.
Nouveau but:
La société a pour but toutes prestations visant à: - évaluer, renforcer et déployer des forces et des valeurs en lien avec les besoins d'une entreprise ou d'un groupe déterminé;
- concevoir, présenter ou participer à des conférences, écrits, discussions, animations d'ateliers, enseignements, cours permettant la transmission de valeurs permettant le développement personnel, l'échange et la collaboration.
La société peut:
- exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
- créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger;
- participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
- accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des associés ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts. Selon déclaration du 21.12.2023, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bernez (nom d'usage Belleux), Cécile, citoyenne française, à Morges, associée et présidente des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00;
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA (CHE-105.760.685), à Martigny, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gay, Virginie, de Sion, à Fully, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associée et gérante, avec signature collective à deux, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005880066, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Gérance CASA Sàrl, à Val de Bagnes, CHE-367.153.437, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 4 du 07.01.2021, Publ. 1005066797).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Sarrasin Eugster, Caroline, de Bovernier, à Val de Bagnes, associée et présidente des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: à Bagnes, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle];
Gay, Virginie, de Martigny, à Bovernier, gérante, avec signature individuelle.