Christian Gattiker
domiciled in Kilchberg, from Rüschlikon Active mandates: Bank Julius Bär & Co. AG Connected persons: Dorota Michalina Pawlicka, Marek Nowak, Nicole Lehmann and more You can stay up to date through "Christian Gattiker", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Gattiker"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Gattiker", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Gattiker"
|
|
Christian Gattiker
domiciled in Brütten, from Oberrieden Active mandates: Revoltab AG Connected persons: Sven Vogel, Olaf Schmitz, Daniel Pfister and more You can stay up to date through "Christian Gattiker", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Gattiker"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Gattiker", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Gattiker"
|
Places where people with the name Christian Gattiker live
Sectors in which people with the name Christian Gattiker work
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Architectural and engineering activities
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Architectural and engineering activities
Private persons with the name Christian Gattiker
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christian Gattiker
Publication number: HR02-1005736712, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Revoltab AG, in Zug, CHE-466.595.170, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 241 vom 12.12.2022, Publ. 1005625868).
Statutenänderung:
14.04.2023.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Revoltab Ltd).
Sitz neu:
Cham.
Domizil neu:
Maschinengasse 16, 6330 Cham.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre können rechtsgültig durch Schreiben oder elektronisch an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen erfolgen. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gattiker, Christian, von Oberrieden, in Brütten, Prokurist, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Vogel, Sven, von Köniz, in Lostorf, Prokurist, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 2087257, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Performa Investment Advisory AG, in Zug, CHE-160.395.636, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 200 vom 16.10.2014, Publ. 1772369).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gattiker, Christian, von Küsnacht ZH, in Erlenbach ZH, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1772369, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Performa Investment Advisory AG, in Zug, CHE-160.395.636, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 23.07.2014, Publ. 1628919).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gattiker, Christian, von Küsnacht ZH, in Erlenbach ZH, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.