Pius Otto Gasser
domiciled in Zürich, from Lungern Active mandates: METALLOINVEST TRADING AG, Phoenix Capital AG and more Connected persons: Mariia Rodionova, Lidija Matosevic, Lidija Matosevic and more You can stay up to date through "Pius Otto Gasser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pius Otto Gasser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Pius Otto Gasser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pius Otto Gasser"
|
Places where people with the name Pius Otto Gasser live
Sectors in which people with the name Pius Otto Gasser work
Trading with various goods
Operation of other financial institutions
Services regarding management consulting
Operation of investment companies
Other construction
Services for banks and credit institutions
Leasing of intangible assets
IT services
Trading with various goods
Operation of other financial institutions
Services regarding management consulting
Operation of investment companies
Other construction
Services for banks and credit institutions
Leasing of intangible assets
IT services
Private persons with the name Pius Otto Gasser
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Pius Otto Gasser
Publication number: HR02-1006096908, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
METALLOINVEST TRADING AG, in Cham, CHE-114.426.044, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 44 vom 04.03.2024, Publ. 1005976217).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Krestinin, Oleg, russischer Staatsangehöriger, in Moskau (RU), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gasser, Pius Otto, von Lungern, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005673956, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Josef Christen AG, in Rain, CHE-105.800.072, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 3 vom 05.01.2023, Publ. 1005644331).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gasser, Pius, von Lungern, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Christen, Marcel, von Wolfenschiessen, in Rain, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005665519, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Taris Swiss APP Solutions AG, bisher in Stans, CHE-183.792.416, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 24.08.2021, Publ. 1005276377).
Statutenänderung:
11.01.2023.
Firma neu:
Taris Swiss APP Solutions AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
[Die Übersetzungen werden im Handelsregister gelöscht].
Sitz neu:
Unterengstringen.
Domizil neu:
Wechselächerstrasse 43, 8103 Unterengstringen. [Streichung der Statutenbestimmung über die mit Gewährungsbeschluss vom 13.11.2020 eingeführte Erhöhung aus genehmigtem Kapital infolge Fristablauf.] [gestrichen: Die Gesellschaft hat mit Beschluss vom 13.11.2020 eine genehmigte Kapitalerhöhung gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten beschlossen.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 11.01.2023 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gasser, Pius Otto, von Lungern, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stanic, Damir, von Oberengstringen, in Unterengstringen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leutenegger, Marco, von Münchwilen (TG), in Unterengstringen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].