Dr. Conrad Frey
domiciled in Zumikon, from Schaffhausen Active mandates: OBAG Synergie AG in Liquidation, Xerotrading AG in Liquidation and more Connected persons: Dina Monica Meier, Toni Eduard Meier, Monica Elisabeth Meier-Feil and more You can stay up to date through "Dr. Conrad Frey", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Conrad Frey"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dr. Conrad Frey", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Conrad Frey"
|
Places where people with the name Conrad Frey live
Sectors in which people with the name Conrad Frey work
Water and sewage utilities
Trading with various goods
Religious, political or secular associations
Other construction
Manufacturing and processing of glass and ceramic
Operation of other financial institutions
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trading with machines
Operation of an pension fund
Water and sewage utilities
Trading with various goods
Religious, political or secular associations
Other construction
Manufacturing and processing of glass and ceramic
Operation of other financial institutions
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trading with machines
Operation of an pension fund
Private persons with the name Conrad Frey
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Conrad Frey
Publication number: HR02-1006028605, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
STIFTUNG KINDER- UND JUGENDMUSEUM, in Zumikon, CHE-109.668.096, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 11 vom 17.01.2023, Publ. 1005653699).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Frey, Dr. Conrad, von Schaffhausen, in Zumikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wieland, Men, von Scuol, in Scuol, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frey, Evelyne, von Schaffhausen, in Maur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Guenat, Rahel, genannt Raquel, von Zürich, in Stäfa, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005803639, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Personalfürsorgestiftung der Firma Ifolor AG, in Kreuzlingen, CHE-109.780.132, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 24.11.2020, Publ. 1005030507). [Teils-Aktualisierung der Funktionsbezeichnung.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Didier, von Zeneggen, in Dielsdorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frey, Dr. Conrad, von Schaffhausen, in Zumikon, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schwarz, Hannes, von Tägerwilen, in Bottighofen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005788149, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
OBAG Synergie AG, in Zürich, CHE-105.999.513, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 30.01.2023, Publ. 1005664193).
Firma neu:
OBAG Synergie AG in Liquidation.
Weitere Adressen:
[gestrichen: c/o Dr. C. Frey, Postfach, 8034 Zürich].
Liquidationsadresse:
, c/o Frey & Jud Rechtsanwälte, Herr Dr. Conrad Frey, Klausstrasse 43, 8008 Zürich.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 13.06.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frey, Conrad, von Schaffhausen, in Zumikon, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.