Caspar Florian Forrer
domiciled in Zürich, from St. Gallen Active mandates: Forrer Stieger Architekten AG Connected persons: Jürg Martin Stieger You can stay up to date through "Caspar Florian Forrer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Caspar Florian Forrer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Caspar Florian Forrer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Caspar Florian Forrer"
|
Places where people with the name Caspar Florian Forrer live
Sectors in which people with the name Caspar Florian Forrer work
Architectural and engineering activities
Architectural and engineering activities
Private persons with the name Caspar Florian Forrer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Caspar Florian Forrer
Publication number: HR02-1006021487, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Forrer Stieger Architekten AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-102.120.319, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 16.11.2022, Publ. 1005605659). Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 17.01.2024 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dr. Rietmann & Partner AG, Wirtschaftsprüfer und Steuerberater (CHE-102.084.882), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stieger, Jürg, von Oberriet (SG), in St. Gallen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Forrer, Caspar Florian, von St. Gallen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in St. Gallen].
Publication number: 6543650, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Atima AG, in St. Gallen, CH-320.3.015.519-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 17.12.2008, S. 19, Publ. 4786582).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Krebs, Rudolf, von Wattenwil, in Rorschacherberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Forrer, Caspar Florian, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stieger, Jürg Martin, von Oberriet SG, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5826992, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Forrer Krebs Ley Architekturbüro AG, in St. Gallen, CH-320.3.023.516-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 15.01.2007, S. 9, Publ. 3725300).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Keller, Stefan, von Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Forrer, Caspar Florian, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.