Lukas Felber
domiciled in Kriens, from Kriens Active mandates: Elektro Felber AG Connected persons: Bruno Felber You can stay up to date through "Lukas Felber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lukas Felber"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Lukas Felber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lukas Felber"
|
|
Lukas Felber
domiciled in Brugg, from Schötz Active mandates: Syntegon Packaging Systems AG Connected persons: Patrick Eberwein, Marek Pesik, Cyrille Roland Füllemann and more You can stay up to date through "Lukas Felber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lukas Felber"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Lukas Felber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lukas Felber"
|
Places where people with the name Lukas Felber live
Sectors in which people with the name Lukas Felber work
Other construction
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Other construction
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Private persons with the name Lukas Felber
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Lukas Felber
Publication number: HR02-1005936705, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Syntegon Packaging Systems AG, in Beringen, CHE-108.702.419, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 151 vom 08.08.2023, Publ. 1005812073).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Felber, Lukas, von Schötz, in Brugg AG (Brugg), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005507631, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Syntegon Pouch Systems AG, in Beringen, CHE-114.444.556, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 78 vom 23.04.2020, Publ. 1004875955).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baumann, Rudolf Max, von Altdorf (UR), in Tägerwilen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stutz, Roger, von Lommis, in Müllheim Dorf (Müllheim), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Felber, Lukas, von Schötz, in Brugg AG (Brugg), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004971687, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Elektro Felber AG, in Kriens, CHE-107.923.840, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 42 vom 01.03.2018, Publ. 4085147).
Statutenänderung:
27.08.2020.
Zweck neu:
Ausführung und Projektierung von elektrischen Installationen und Schaltungen sowie Handel jeglicher Art mit elektrischen Apparaten und Beleuchtungskörpern;
Übernahme von Vertretungen;
Beteiligungen;
Erwerb, Nutzung, Veräusserung, Vermietung und Verwaltung von Liegenschaften.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 27.08.2020 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bucher Treuhand AG (CHE-107.243.981), in Kriens, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Felber, Lukas, von Kriens, in Kriens, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Felber, Bruno, von Römerswil, in Kriens, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].