John Martin Feigl
domiciled in Nürensdorf, from Fischingen Active mandates: Feigl Advisory Connected persons: Petra Priscilla Feigl-Fässler You can stay up to date through "John Martin Feigl", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "John Martin Feigl"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "John Martin Feigl", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "John Martin Feigl"
|
Places where people with the name John Martin Feigl live
Sectors in which people with the name John Martin Feigl work
Services regarding management consulting
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name John Martin Feigl
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: John Martin Feigl
Publication number: HR02-1006099525, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Spectroplast AG, in Schlieren, CHE-427.587.592, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 05.07.2024, Publ. 1006076579).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Feigl, John Martin, von Fischingen, in Nürensdorf, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gürsoy, Akin, türkischer Staatsangehöriger, in Winterthur, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mäder, Luis Dario, von Basel, in Männedorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005651421, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Spectroplast AG, in Schlieren, CHE-427.587.592, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 08.04.2022, Publ. 1005446190).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Feigl, John Martin, von Fischingen, in Nürensdorf, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005596738, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
PILFOR AG, in Basel, CHE-432.447.583, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 29.06.2022, Publ. 1005507576).
Firma neu:
PILFOR AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 18.10.2022 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Feigl, John Martin, von Fischingen, in Nürensdorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].