Beat Fehlmann
domiciled in Möriken AG, from Möriken-Wildegg Active mandates: RTB Regionale Technische Betriebe, SikaBau AG and more Connected persons: Manfred Zwahlen, Felix Beat Rieser, Ariane Fankhauser and more You can stay up to date through "Beat Fehlmann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Fehlmann"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Beat Fehlmann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Fehlmann"
|
Places where people with the name Beat Fehlmann live
Sectors in which people with the name Beat Fehlmann work
Electrical power production and utilities
Other construction
Religious, political or secular associations
Electrical power production and utilities
Other construction
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Beat Fehlmann
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Beat Fehlmann
Publication number: HR02-1005441083, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
RTB Regionale Technische Betriebe, in Möriken-Wildegg, CHE-112.789.719, Institut des öffentlichen Rechts (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 17.03.2022, Publ. 1005429412).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rieser, Felix, von Affeltrangen und Eschlikon, in Möriken-Wildegg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Doessegger, Andreas, von Seon, in Möriken-Wildegg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Fehlmann, Beat, von Möriken-Wildegg, in Möriken-Wildegg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Klemm, Veronika, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Niederlenz, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Link, Jürg Werner, von Burg (AG) und Niederlenz, in Niederlenz, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schärer, André, von Möriken-Wildegg, in Möriken-Wildegg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005359923, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
MB Vertriebs GmbH, in Toffen, CHE-401.354.827, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 26.01.2015, S.0, Publ. 1949881).
Firma neu:
MB Vertriebs GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 10.12.2021 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fehlmann, Beat René Werner, von Seengen, in Toffen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 19 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004660213, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Schäfer Generalunternehmung AG, in Dottikon, CHE-109.389.986, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 239 vom 10.12.2018, Publ. 1004516657).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fehlmann, Beat, von Möriken-Wildegg, in Möriken-Wildegg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.