Mônica Favre
domiciled in Palézieux-Village, from Goumoëns Active mandates: GRANICA Sàrl Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Mônica Favre", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Mônica Favre"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Mônica Favre", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Mônica Favre"
|
Places where people with the name Mônica Favre live
Sectors in which people with the name Mônica Favre work
Sport services
Sport services
Private persons with the name Mônica Favre
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Mônica Favre
Publication number: 2936733, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
BONSAÏ INVESTMENT AG, in Frauenfeld, CHE-101.020.388, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 39 vom 26.02.2007, S. 16, Publ. 3795968).
Firma neu:
BONSAÏ INVESTMENT AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(BONSAÏ INVESTMENT SA en liquidation) (BONSAÏ INVESTMENT Ltd in liquidation).
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 01.07.2016 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fasel, Serge, von Vuissens, in Genf, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Favre, Monica, von Avully, in Mies, Präsidentin und Liquidatorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsidentin mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Frauchiger, Walter, von Eriswil, in Frauenfeld, Delegierter und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Delegierter mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 4296684, Commercial Registry Office Valais
Holding Gelasi SA, à Sierre, CH-626.3.000.804-9, société anonyme (FOSC no 45 du 06.03.2007, p. 19, publ. 3812390).
Personne et signature radiée:
Favre, Monica, de Avully, à Mies, administratrice unique, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personnes:
Patané, Fabrizio, de Bellevue, à Thônex, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Schneeberger, Benoît, de Genève, à Lancy, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux;
Reversy, Françoise, de Genève, à Veyrier, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 2197746, Commercial Registry Office Valais
Holding Gelasi SA, à Sierre, société anonyme (FOSC no 60 du 26.03.1996, p. 1729).
Bureaux :
c/o Fasel, Bochatay Tsimaratos, 47 rue du 31 Décembre, 1207 Genève. [biffé: Bureaux : c/o Mlle Madeleine Wiedmer, 12 Boulevard du Théâtre à Genève].
Personnes et signatures radiées:
Wiedmer, Madeleine, de Genève, à Genève, administratrice unique, avec signature individuelle;
Raisin-Dadre, Didier, de Chêne-Bougeries, à Genève, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personnes:
Favre, Monica, de Avully, à Mies, administratrice unique, avec signature individuelle;
Dominik Spiess SA - Conseil et Révision, à Genève, organe de révision.