Céline Fallet
domiciled in Zürich, from Val-de-Ruz Active mandates: Verein wemakeit.ch, wemakeit AG Connected persons: Maria Graziella Luggen, Rea Eggli, Maria Graziella Luggen and more You can stay up to date through "Céline Fallet", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Céline Fallet"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Céline Fallet", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Céline Fallet"
|
Places where people with the name Céline Fallet live
Sectors in which people with the name Céline Fallet work
Religious, political or secular associations
Other Business-to-Business services
Religious, political or secular associations
Other Business-to-Business services
Private persons with the name Céline Fallet
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Céline Fallet
Publication number: HR02-1006061960, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Verein wemakeit.ch, in Zürich, CHE-466.908.257, Verein (SHAB Nr. 81 vom 27.04.2023, Publ. 1005733217).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Davies, Leandro, von Köniz, in Rüschlikon, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fallet, Céline, von Val-de-Ruz, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Eggli, Rea, von Reichenbach im Kandertal, in Zürich, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten [bisher: Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Luggen, Maria Graziella, von Termen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Publication number: HR02-1005943521, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
OOMNIUM AG, in Zürich, CHE-362.911.768, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 16.11.2023, Publ. 1005886100). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung vom 17.06.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fallet, Céline, von Val-de-Ruz, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
AEGERTER+BRÄNDLE AG für Steuer- und Wirtschaftsberatung (CHE-105.827.941), in Rapperswil-Jona, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005733217, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Verein wemakeit.ch, in Zürich, CHE-466.908.257, Verein (SHAB Nr. 193 vom 05.10.2021, Publ. 1005304810).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gees, Johannes, von Davos, in Zürich, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fallet, Céline, von Val-de-Ruz, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift.