Claudio Egli
domiciled in Corzoneso, from Zürich Active mandates: EGLIDESIGN sagl Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Claudio Egli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claudio Egli"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Claudio Egli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claudio Egli"
|
|
Claudio Egli
domiciled in Kreuzlingen, from Wald (ZH) Active mandates: ecten gmbh, Fahrion & Partner Gartenbau AG Connected persons: Jana Larissa Egli, Jonas Gerber, Oliver Fahrion You can stay up to date through "Claudio Egli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claudio Egli"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Claudio Egli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claudio Egli"
|
Places where people with the name Claudio Egli live
Sectors in which people with the name Claudio Egli work
Operation of design, graphics and jewellery studios
Architectural and engineering activities
Gardening and landscaping
Operation of design, graphics and jewellery studios
Architectural and engineering activities
Gardening and landscaping
Private persons with the name Claudio Egli
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Claudio Egli
Publication number: 2602375, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Fahrion & Partner Gartenbau AG, in Kreuzlingen, CHE-108.425.013, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 5 vom 09.01.2012, Publ. 6495886).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schnyder, Mathis, von Sirnach, in Illighausen (Lengwil), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Egli, Claudio, von Wald ZH, in Kreuzlingen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Tamins, ohne eingetragene Funktion mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].
Publication number: 2483969, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Alterspflegeheim Debora AG, in Amriswil, CHE-107.074.939, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 8 vom 14.01.2014, Publ. 1283503).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Egli, Claudio, von Wil SG, in Staad SG (Thal), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Studer, Benedikt, genannt Beni, von Hasle LU, in Hefenhofen, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dufner, Dr. Thomas Fridolin, von Kirchberg SG, in Kreuzlingen, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Flück, Werner, von Mümliswil-Ramiswil, in Kesswil, Delegierter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Brandenberger-Amrhein, Fabienne Monika, von Engelberg, in Ottoberg (Märstetten), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1974729, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Genossenschaft St.Galler Jugendheime, in St. Gallen, CHE-106.060.343, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 03.02.2014, Publ. 1321879).
Statutenänderung:
09.05.2014.
Zweck neu:
Betrieb und Erhalt von Jugendheimen auf gemeinnütziger Basis.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Egli, Claudio, von Wil SG, in Staad SG (Thal), Mitglied der Verwaltung und Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dornbierer, Jasmin, von Thal und Landiswil, in Staad SG (Thal), Kassierin (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.