Adrien Dubuis
domiciled in Savièse, from Savièse Active mandates: New Bisse SA, Angèle 3970 Holding Sàrl and more Connected persons: Jonathan Reynard You can stay up to date through "Adrien Dubuis", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Adrien Dubuis"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Adrien Dubuis", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Adrien Dubuis"
|
Places where people with the name Adrien Dubuis live
Sectors in which people with the name Adrien Dubuis work
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Operation of investment companies
Operation of restaurants
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Operation of investment companies
Operation of restaurants
Private persons with the name Adrien Dubuis
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Adrien Dubuis
Publication number: HR02-1005705046, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
FFF AG, in Evilard, CHE-108.756.527, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 42 vom 01.03.2016, Publ. 2694967).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dubuis, Adrien, von Evilard, in Evilard, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dubuis, Rosemarie, von Evilard, in Evilard, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Dubuis-Liebenhagen, Rosemarie, Mitglied, Sekretärin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Dubuis, Eric, von Evilard, in Hägendorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005705026, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Adrien Dubuis Kraftwerke AG, in Evilard, CHE-369.902.747, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 23 vom 04.02.2014, S.0, Publ. 1325937).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dubuis, Adrien, von Evilard, in Evilard, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dubuis, Rosemarie, von Evilard, in Evilard, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Dubuis, Eric, von Evilard, in Hägendorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Stoll, Daniel, von Gelterkinden, in Evilard, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005137822, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
New Bisse SA, à Savièse, CHE-101.405.535, société anonyme (No. FOSC 245 du 18.12.2014, p.0, Publ. 1889021).
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de Piotte 1, 1965 Savièse.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Dumoulin, Guy-Noël, de Savièse, à Savièse, président, secrétaire, avec signature individuelle;
Dumoulin, Marie Elisabeth, de Savièse, à Savièse, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Dubuis, Adrien, de Savièse, à Savièse, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle.