Christoph Dörig
domiciled in Flumserberg Tboden, from Appenzell Active mandates: Hotel Tannenboden AG Connected persons: Romana Dörig-Kurath, Hannes Kurath, Bernadette Kurath-Good You can stay up to date through "Christoph Dörig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Dörig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christoph Dörig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Dörig"
|
|
Christoph Dörig
domiciled in St. Gallen, from Appenzell Active mandates: Personalvorsorgestiftung Elenka, Pensionskasse Provisio Connected persons: Petra Martina Moser Zwahlen, Markus Gilgen, Adrian Kambli and more You can stay up to date through "Christoph Dörig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Dörig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christoph Dörig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Dörig"
|
|
Christoph Dörig
domiciled in St. Gallen, from St. Gallen Active mandates: Bühler + Scherler AG Connected persons: Thomas Reichert, Adrian Kambli, Philipp Hanimann and more You can stay up to date through "Christoph Dörig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Dörig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christoph Dörig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Dörig"
|
Places where people with the name Christoph Dörig live
Sectors in which people with the name Christoph Dörig work
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Operation of an pension fund
Architectural and engineering activities
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Operation of an pension fund
Architectural and engineering activities
Private persons with the name Christoph Dörig
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christoph Dörig
Publication number: HR02-1005619619, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Bühler + Scherler AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-105.936.688, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 227 vom 22.11.2022, Publ. 1005610067).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dörig, Christoph, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien beschränkt auf den Hauptsitz.
Publication number: HR02-1005377197, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Brüewilzucht GmbH, in Gossau (SG), CHE-113.351.745, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 06.07.2018, S.0, Publ. 4342145).
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter sind brieflich zuzustellen. [Nachtrag].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dörig, Dominik, von Appenzell, in Muolen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dörig, Christoph, von Appenzell, in Gossau SG, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00. [Mitteilungen: Nachtrag des im SHAB Nr. 229 vom 25.11.2008 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 9'660 vom 19.11.2008.]
Publication number: HR02-1004572608, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Personalfürsorge Scherler Bern, in Bern, CHE-109.782.450, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 200 vom 14.10.2016, Publ. 3108395).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meyer, Christoph, von Feusisberg, in Diepoldsau, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dörig, Christoph, von Appenzell, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
ENGEL COPERA AG (CHE-103.132.443), in Köniz, Revisionsstelle [bisher: ENGEL COPERA AG (CH-035.3.010.753-4)].