Herbert Dietsche
domiciled in St. Gallen, from Oberriet (SG) and St. Gallen Active mandates: Pollux Reinigungsservice AG Zürich, Armit AG and more Connected persons: Bernhard Dietsche, Marc Frey, Matthias Schmid and more You can stay up to date through "Herbert Dietsche", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Herbert Dietsche"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Herbert Dietsche", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Herbert Dietsche"
|
Places where people with the name Herbert Dietsche live
Sectors in which people with the name Herbert Dietsche work
Cleaning of buildings
Fiduciary services
Services regarding management consulting
Cleaning of buildings
Fiduciary services
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Herbert Dietsche
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Herbert Dietsche
Publication number: HR02-1006103571, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
NAROPA REHA AG, in Thal, CHE-108.690.207, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 20.05.2020, Publ. 1004893836). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 07.11.2013 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dietsche, Herbert, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Dietsche, Bernhard, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kröher, Fabian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Ingolstadt (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Pielmeier, Philipp, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Rott am Inn (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Derungs, Richard Michael, von Herisau, in Uzwil, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Calanda Audit AG (CHE-392.204.397), in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005702691, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pollux Reinigungsservice AG Zürich, in Zürich, CHE-107.421.946, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 22.02.2017, S.0, Publ. 3363057).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kauf, Luc, von Felben-Wellhausen, in Wil SG, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wüst, Hanspeter, von Oberriet SG, in Gossau SG, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dietsche, Herbert, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Dietsche, Bernhard, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004870278, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
NAROPA REHA AG, in Thal, CHE-108.690.207, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 150 vom 05.08.2016, S.0, Publ. 2990315).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dietsche, Herbert, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Dietsche, Bernhard, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.