Bruno Derungs
domiciled in Jona, from Lumnezia Active mandates: Derungs Holding AG, CCC Real Estate AG and more Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Bruno Derungs", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bruno Derungs"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Bruno Derungs", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bruno Derungs"
|
|
Bruno Derungs
domiciled in Meilen, from Lumnezia Active mandates: ZaiCo GmbH Connected persons: Huy Lao Derungs-Khov You can stay up to date through "Bruno Derungs", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bruno Derungs"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Bruno Derungs", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bruno Derungs"
|
Places where people with the name Bruno Derungs live
Sectors in which people with the name Bruno Derungs work
Operation of investment companies
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Fiduciary services
Services regarding management consulting
Operation of investment companies
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Fiduciary services
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Bruno Derungs
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Bruno Derungs
Publication number: 3964839, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
UTRANS AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-100.797.422, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 193 vom 06.10.2015, Publ. 2409273).
Firma neu:
UTRANS AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 18.12.2017 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Derungs, Bruno, von Lumnezia, in Jona (Rapperswil-Jona), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 3962359, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Carrera Consult Ltd., in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-107.412.290, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 13.10.2015, Publ. 2422363).
Firma neu:
Carrera Consult Ltd. in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Carrera Consult AG in Liquidation). Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 18.12.2017 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Derungs, Bruno, von Lumnezia, in Jona (Rapperswil-Jona), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2422363, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Carrera Consult Ltd., in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-107.412.290, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 13.01.2012, Publ. 6503456).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Altmeyer, Roger, von Basel, in Hombrechtikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Derungs, Bruno, von Lumnezia, in Jona (Rapperswil-Jona), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.