Olivier Derivaz
domiciled in Monthey, from Vernayaz and Salvan Active mandates: Fondation "La Maison", Massongex, Fondation Terre des hommes - Valais and more Connected persons: Jean François Fernand Beth, Nathalie Noëlle Revaz, André Morand and more You can stay up to date through "Olivier Derivaz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Olivier Derivaz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Olivier Derivaz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Olivier Derivaz"
|
Places where people with the name Olivier Derivaz live
Sectors in which people with the name Olivier Derivaz work
Religious, political or secular associations
Other social services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trading with various goods
Religious, political or secular associations
Other social services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trading with various goods
Private persons with the name Olivier Derivaz
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Olivier Derivaz
Publication number: HR02-1005806773, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation Terre des hommes - Valais, à Massongex, CHE-103.514.336, fondation (No. FOSC 213 du 02.11.2021, Publ. 1005325423).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Favre, Armand, de Monthey, à Choëx (Monthey), membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Derivaz, Olivier, de Salvan, à Monthey, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Revaz, Nathalie, de Nendaz, à Saint-Maurice, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 1851479, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
WHITE SANDS SA en liquidation, à Port-Valais, CHE-109.045.015, société anonyme (No. FOSC 206 du 24.10.2014, Publ. 1786603).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Derivaz, Olivier, de Salvan, à Monthey, membre de l'administration spéciale, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre de l'administration spéciale];
Genilloud, Dominique, de Bulle, à Saint-Maurice, membre de l'administration spéciale, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre de l'administration spéciale];
Gillabert, Denis, de Val-d'Illiez, à Monthey, membre de l'administration spéciale, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre de l'administration spéciale].
Publication number: 1786603, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Rectification de l'inscription au registre journalier No 1'929 du 28.08.2013, publiée dans la FOSC No 168 du 02.09.2013, publ. No 1'055'071.WHITE SANDS SA en liquidation, à Port-Valais, CHE-109.045.015, société anonyme (No. FOSC 168 du 02.09.2013, Publ. 1055071).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Derivaz, Olivier, de Salvan, à Monthey, membre de l'administration spéciale [données personnelles non spécifiées précédemment].