Roger Degonda
domiciled in Widen, from Disentis/Mustér Active mandates: raumfachwerk ag in Liquidation, wohnform immobilien ag and more Connected persons: Marcel Clerc Tromp, Stanislaus Scherrer, Angela Scherrer-Degonda You can stay up to date through "Roger Degonda", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roger Degonda"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Roger Degonda", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roger Degonda"
|
Places where people with the name Roger Degonda live
Sectors in which people with the name Roger Degonda work
Architectural and engineering activities
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Architectural and engineering activities
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Roger Degonda
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Roger Degonda
Publication number: HR02-1005764675, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
raumfachwerk ag, in Dietikon, CHE-114.027.632, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 81 vom 29.04.2013, S.0, Publ. 7167422).
Firma neu:
raumfachwerk ag in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 01.06.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Degonda, Roger, von Disentis/Mustér, in Widen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Regensdorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Clerc Tromp, Marcel, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Clerc, Marcel].
Publication number: HR02-1004765708, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
wohnform immobilien ag, in Regensdorf, CHE-150.174.950, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 57 vom 21.03.2012, S.0, Publ. 6603116).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Degonda, Roger, von Disentis/Mustér, in Widen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Regensdorf].
Publication number: 7167422, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
raumfachwerk ag, in Dietikon, CH-020.3.031.908-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 19.01.2010, S. 30, Publ. 5447470).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sauer, Tihomir, kroatischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Degonda, Roger, von Disentis/Mustér, in Regensdorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Uitikon].