Claude Darbellay
domiciled in Savièse, from Martigny Active mandates: Imprimerie Saprim, Favre & Darbellay Connected persons: Pierre-André Favre You can stay up to date through "Claude Darbellay", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claude Darbellay"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Claude Darbellay", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claude Darbellay"
|
|
Claude Darbellay
domiciled in Cortaillod, from Martigny Active mandates: Kulturfonds der ProLitteris, ProLitteris, Schweizerische Genossenschaft für Urheberrechte an Literatur und Kunst Connected persons: Christophe Werner Biber, Thomas Manuel Kramer, Anna Regina Helbling Gerster and more You can stay up to date through "Claude Darbellay", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claude Darbellay"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Claude Darbellay", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claude Darbellay"
|
|
Claude Darbellay
domiciled in Genève, from Liddes Active mandates: Entre Mots et Notes Connected persons: Christiane Cécile Favre, Christian Caloz You can stay up to date through "Claude Darbellay", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claude Darbellay"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Claude Darbellay", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claude Darbellay"
|
Places where people with the name Claude Darbellay live
Sectors in which people with the name Claude Darbellay work
Operation of a printing plant and/or bindery
Religious, political or secular associations
Legal counsel
Operation of a printing plant and/or bindery
Religious, political or secular associations
Legal counsel
Private persons with the name Claude Darbellay
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Claude Darbellay
Publication number: HR01-1005919328, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Entre Mots et Notes, à Anniviers, CHE-459.284.581, c/o Christian Caloz, Route Principale 1, 3961 St-Luc, association (Nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
03.01.2013. 01.02.2014. 07.11.2015.
But:
L'Association Entre Mots et Notes a pour buts: De rassembler des créations et d'éventuellement soutenir la production d'œuvres artistiques initiées par les membres en vue de son festival annuel.
Ces œuvres relèvent essentiellement des arts vivants:
concerts, lectures de textes avec ou sans mises en scène théâtrales, performances sonores, musicales et/ou littéraires. Elle peut aussi s'ouvrir aux arts plastiques. De permettre la réalisation d'ateliers pendant le festival. D'acquérir les biens et le matériel nécessaire à la réalisation de ses buts.
Ressources:
Cotisations annuelles des membres, subventions, dons, legs, recettes résultant des activités.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Caloz, Christian, de Anniviers, à Anniviers, président du comité, avec signature collective à trois;
Darbellay, Claude, de Liddes, à Genève, vice-président du comité, avec signature collective à trois;
Favre, Christiane, de Anniviers, à Anniviers, membre du comité, trésorière, avec signature collective à trois.
Publication number: 2008981, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kulturfonds der ProLitteris, in Zürich, CHE-238.107.050, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 47 vom 10.03.2014, Publ. 1387355).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kelter, Jochen, von Tägerwilen, in Ermatingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hefti, Ernst, von Glarus Süd, in Münsterlingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
KPMG AG (CHE-106.084.881), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [bisher: KPMG AG (CH-020.3.001.933-8)];
Darbellay, Claude, von Martigny, in Cortaillod, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kübler, Philip, von Uster, in Kilchberg ZH, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6415512, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ProLitteris, Schweizerische Urheberrechtsgesellschaft für Literatur und bildende Kunst, Genossenschaft, in Zürich, CH-020.5.901.264-6, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 85 vom 04.05.2010, S. 30, Publ. 5616008).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kelter, Jochen, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Tägerwilen, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Haupt, Men, von Regensberg, in Utzenstorf, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident der Verwaltung mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Keller, Stefan, von Birwinken, in Zürich, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Maurer, Alexandra, von Rubigen, in Genève, Vizepräsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in St. Gallen, Mitglied der Verwaltung ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Darbellay, Claude, von Martigny, in Cortaillod, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Voser, Andrea, von Neuenhof, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.