Vincent Costa
domiciled in Pully, from Nendaz Active mandates: Helicopter School Association Connected persons: Marc Schnetzer, Pirmin Birchler, Dominik Simmen You can stay up to date through "Vincent Costa", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Vincent Costa"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Vincent Costa", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Vincent Costa"
|
Places where people with the name Vincent Costa live
Sectors in which people with the name Vincent Costa work
Other services in education
Other services in education
Private persons with the name Vincent Costa
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Vincent Costa
Publication number: HR02-1005049312, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Swiss Helicopter School Association, bisher in Teufen (AR), CHE-112.104.919, Verein (SHAB Nr. 148 vom 03.08.2018, Publ. 4396189).
Statutenänderung:
25.03.2020.
Name neu:
Helicopter School Association.
Sitz neu:
Benken (SG).
Domizil neu:
Rötlistrasse 2c, 8717 Benken SG.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brun, Guido, von Malters, in Teufen AR, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Brandt, Jonathan, von Fällanden, in Bellikon, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schnetzer, Marc, von Uzwil, in Benken SG, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Simmen, Dominik, von Safenwil, in Gontenschwil, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Costa, Vincent, von Nendaz, in Pully, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 1333073, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Swiss Helicopter School Association, bisher in Belp, CHE-112.104.919, Verein (SHAB Nr. 24 vom 03.02.2011, S. 5, Publ. 6016088).
Statutenänderung:
24.01.2014.
Sitz neu:
Teufen AR.
Domizil neu:
c/o Guido Brun, Stofelweid 1, 9053 Teufen AR.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bühler, Stephan, von Gams, in Buchs AG, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wegmüller, Jürg, von Rüegsau, in Rubigen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Diener, Thomas, von Bubikon, in Meggen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Costa, Vincent, von Nendaz, in Pully, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.