Marco Circelli
domiciled in Zürich, from Kriens Active mandates: M&D Investment AG in Liquidation, Swiss Living Construction AG in Liquidation and more Connected persons: Donato Circelli, Karin Rachel Circelli-Zemp, Karin Rachel Circelli-Zemp You can stay up to date through "Marco Circelli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Circelli"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marco Circelli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Circelli"
|
|
Marco Circelli
domiciled in Däniken, from Italy Active mandates: circelli engineering solutions GmbH Connected persons: Paolo Circelli You can stay up to date through "Marco Circelli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Circelli"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marco Circelli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Circelli"
|
Places where people with the name Marco Circelli live
Sectors in which people with the name Marco Circelli work
Operation of other financial institutions
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Production, rental and distribution of films and TV shows
Architectural and engineering activities
Operation of other financial institutions
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Production, rental and distribution of films and TV shows
Architectural and engineering activities
Private persons with the name Marco Circelli
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Marco Circelli
Publication number: HR02-1006077777, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Drehpunkt Studio GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-159.362.475, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 174 vom 08.09.2023, Publ. 1005833609).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aschwanden, Christian Vincenz, von Seelisberg, in Bern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Circelli, Marco, von Kriens, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Circelli-Zemp, Karin Rachel, von Malters, in Zürich, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR02-1005977273, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
M&D Investment AG, in Ebikon, CHE-418.500.735, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 22.04.2021, Publ. 1005156073).
Firma neu:
M&D Investment AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft hat sich mit Beschluss der ausserordentlichen Generalversammlung vom 27.02.2024 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Circelli, Marco, von Kriens, in Kilchberg (ZH), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005761084, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Swiss Living Construction AG, in Zürich, CHE-298.462.371, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 146 vom 29.07.2022, Publ. 1005531706).
Firma neu:
Swiss Living Construction AG in Liquidation.
Weitere Adressen:
Liquidationsadresse:, c/o Marco Circelli, Frohburgstrasse 72, 8006 Zürich.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 26.05.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Circelli, Marco, von Kriens, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].