Marco Chinni
domiciled in Zürich, from Zürich Active mandates: INVAO Swiss AG in Liq., Fondo Capital AG and more Connected persons: Frank Gessner, Frank Wagner, Philipp Johannes Schulz and more You can stay up to date through "Marco Chinni", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Chinni"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marco Chinni", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Chinni"
|
Places where people with the name Marco Chinni live
Sectors in which people with the name Marco Chinni work
IT services
Operation of other financial institutions
Services regarding management consulting
IT services
Operation of other financial institutions
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Marco Chinni
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Marco Chinni
Publication number: HR02-1006076812, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
INVAO Swiss AG, in Wollerau, CHE-267.310.127, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 03.05.2021, Publ. 1005166572).
Firma neu:
INVAO Swiss AG in Liq..
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 01.07.2024 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Chinni, Marco, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1006036728, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Fondo Capital AG, in Wollerau, CHE-156.458.707, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 78 vom 23.04.2024, Publ. 1006015383).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Walliser, Markus, von Dornach, in Aesch (BL), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Allenbach, Julian, von Reichenbach im Kandertal, in Risch, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Chinni, Marco, von Zürich, in Zürich, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schmidt-Thomé, Constantin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Berlin (DE), Vizepräsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005931557, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
BlockSpirit AG, in Wollerau, CHE-264.766.560, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 161 vom 22.08.2023, Publ. 1005820895).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jacober, Anton F., von Zürich, in Lindau, Delegierter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Chinni, Marco, von Zürich, in Zürich, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Läubli, George, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rohrer, Gregor, von Buchs (SG), in Zürich, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schuler, Marcel, von Rothenthurm, in Weggis, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Taroni, Thomas, von Stalden (VS), in Freienbach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].