Olivier Carrel
domiciled in Bourguillon, from Fribourg and Misery-Courtion Active mandates: DELTA PLAN CARREL Sàrl, Groupe Delta Constructions SARL Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Olivier Carrel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Olivier Carrel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Olivier Carrel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Olivier Carrel"
|
|
Olivier Carrel
domiciled in Vevey, from Vevey Active mandates: Fondation de jumelage des Hôpitaux de la Riviera en liquidation Connected persons: Jean Pierre Berger, Andreas Messikommer, Jesús Pérez Fuentes and more You can stay up to date through "Olivier Carrel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Olivier Carrel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Olivier Carrel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Olivier Carrel"
|
Places where people with the name Olivier Carrel live
Sectors in which people with the name Olivier Carrel work
Architectural and engineering activities
Trading with various goods
Religious, political or secular associations
Architectural and engineering activities
Trading with various goods
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Olivier Carrel
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Olivier Carrel
Publication number: HR02-1005769262, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Elektro Carrel AG, bisher in Lengnau (BE), CHE-109.375.085, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 11.01.2019, Publ. 1004538972).
Statutenänderung:
09.06.2023.
Firma neu:
Leu 22 AG.
Sitz neu:
Grenchen.
Domizil neu:
Leuzigenstrasse 22, 2540 Grenchen.
Zweck neu:
Planung und Ausführung von Elektroinstallationen, Notstromanlagen und PV-Anlagen jeglicher Art sowie Verkauf von Haushaltapparaten und Beleuchtungskörpern. Kann im Übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszwecks zu fördern oder zu erleichtern, wie insbesondere sich an Unternehmen ähnlicher Art im In- und Ausland zu beteiligen und Grundeigentum zu erwerben und zu veräussern, ferner im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten, entwickeln und verkaufen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch eingeschriebenen Brief oder durch E-Mail an die Adressen der im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Aktionäre.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Carrel, Olivier, von Plateau de Diesse, in Lengnau BE, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schaad, Andreas, von Biberist, in Grenchen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005474332, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Schilt Elektro AG, in Grenchen, CHE-105.747.035, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 08.04.2022, Publ. 1005446571).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Carrel, Olivier, von Plateau de Diesse, in Lengnau (BE), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004538972, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Elektro Carrel AG, in Lengnau (BE), CHE-109.375.085, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 253 vom 29.12.2016, Publ. 3253479).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Carrel, Olivier, von Plateau de Diesse, in Lengnau BE, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Mosimann, Beat, von Rüegsau, in Lohn-Ammannsegg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schaad, Andreas, von Biberist, in Grenchen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.