Gérard Carrel
domiciled in Montreux, from Siviriez Active mandates: Balzan & Immer étanchéité S.A., Fondation Château des Novalles and more Connected persons: Aurélie Mottard Egret, Philippe Hermann, Stefano Granieri and more You can stay up to date through "Gérard Carrel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Gérard Carrel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Gérard Carrel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Gérard Carrel"
|
Places where people with the name Gérard Carrel live
Sectors in which people with the name Gérard Carrel work
Other construction
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Religious, political or secular associations
Other construction
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Gérard Carrel
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Gérard Carrel
Publication number: 2834507, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
MOTTET TOITURES Sàrl, à Evionnaz, CHE-115.735.105, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 171 du 03.09.2010, p. 17, Publ. 5798118).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Carrel, Gérard, de Siviriez, à Chernex, associé-gérant et président, avec signature individuelle, pour une part sociale de CHF 16'000.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Cramatte, Mathieu Julien, de Bonfol, à Sembrancher, associé et président des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour une part sociale de CHF 16'000.00;
Mottet, Jean-Charles Gérard Claude, de Evionnaz, à Evionnaz, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour une part sociale de CHF 4'000.00 [précédemment: Mottet, Jean-Charles].
Publication number: 5670682, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
MOTTET TOITURES Sàrl, à Evionnaz, CH-621.4.008.039-8, Sous-Ville 4, 1902 Evionnaz, nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Date des statuts:
1.06.2010.
But:
tous travaux de ferblanterie, couverture, étanchéité et façades (cf statuts).
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.--.
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou courriel. Selon déclaration du 01.06.2010, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Personnes inscrites:
Carrel, Gérard, de Siviriez, à Chernex, associé-gérant et président, avec signature individuelle, pour une part sociale de CHF 16'000.--;
Mottet, Jean-Charles, de Evionnaz, à Evionnaz, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour une part sociale de CHF 4'000.--.