Anne Carrel
domiciled in Chancy, from Chancy Active mandates: Société coopérative de laiterie et d'agriculture de Chancy Connected persons: Arnaud Carrel, Pierre Forestier, Denis Bouvier You can stay up to date through "Anne Carrel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anne Carrel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Anne Carrel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anne Carrel"
|
Places where people with the name Anne Carrel live
Sectors in which people with the name Anne Carrel work
Religious, political or secular associations
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Anne Carrel
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Anne Carrel
Publication number: HR02-1005531212, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Peter-Mieg-Stiftung, in Lenzburg, CHE-104.259.106, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 18.12.2019, Publ. 1004786890).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Carrel, Anne Marie, von Plateau de Diesse, in Möriken-Wildegg, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reichel, Jean-Luc, von Oberburg, in Bolligen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1980985, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Peter-Mieg-Stiftung, in Lenzburg, CHE-104.259.106, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 208 vom 28.10.2014, Publ. 1791491).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baumann, Andreas, von Villigen und Brunegg, in Bern, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schneider, Michael, von Flurlingen, in Aarau, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Carrel, Anne Marie, von Plateau de Diesse, in Möriken-Wildegg, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 1719297, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Peter-Mieg-Stiftung, in Lenzburg, CHE-104.259.106, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2012, Publ. 6560102). [Gemeindefusionen vom 01.01.2013 und 01.01.2014].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Carrel, Anne Marie, von Plateau de Diesse, in Möriken-Wildegg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Lamboing];
Müller, Beat, von Bözberg, in Beinwil am See, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Unerbözberg].